EP2742872 - Folded buttress for use with a surgical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevenson, Richard P. 101 Pine Brook Road Colchester, Connecticut 06415 / US | 02 /
Scirica, Paul A. 264 Thompson Street Huntington, Connecticut 06484 / US | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 13196816.6 | 12.12.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | US201213713261 | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US201213713261 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2742872 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (CN,US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B2017/07214 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gefaltetes Halteelement zur Verwendung mit einer chirurgischen Vorrichtung | [2014/25] | English: | Folded buttress for use with a surgical apparatus | [2014/25] | French: | Renfort plié destiné à être utilisé avec un appareil chirurgical | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 19.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9701989 (FRATER DIRK A [US], et al) [X] 1* page 8, line 15 - page 13, line 8; figures 9-16 *; | [X]US5766188 (IGAKI KEIJI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 5, line 24 - line 36; figure 8 *; | [XI]EP1064883 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0013]; figure 12 * [I] 3; | [X]EP1256318 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 9, 10 *; | [X]EP2090252 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029]; figures 12-18 *; | [X]EP2462880 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070]; figures 18-20 * | by applicant | US5542594 | US5908427 | US5915616 | US5964394 | US5964774 | US6045560 | US6241139 | US6330965 | US2006085034 | US2006135992 | US7128253 | US7334717 | US2013123816 |