EP2746511 - Drive apparatus for a vehicle part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chono, Katsumi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
Karayama, Hidefumi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shigeyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Karya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 04 /
Kotani, Takuya c/o AISIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-1, Aioi-cho, 1-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-0027 / JP | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13197902.3 | 18.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | JP20120275794 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012275794 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2746511 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/48 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
E05F11/483 (EP,US);
F16H19/06 (US);
B60J1/17 (US);
E05F15/689 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/692 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18152 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung eines Fahrzeugteils | [2014/26] | English: | Drive apparatus for a vehicle part | [2014/26] | French: | Système d'actionnement pour un élément de véhicule | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 10.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE102009033472 |