EP2752378 - Chain link of a conveyor chain, conveyor chain of a conveyor device and conveyor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDI Group Germany Material Handling Solutions GmbH Schelpmilserweg 14 b 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/14] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Otto, Thomas Sennehof 13a 33659 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTO Thomas Sennehof 13a 33659 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/14] |
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 13197990.8 | 18.12.2013 | [2014/28] | Priority number, date | DE201310100132 | 08.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013100132 | [2014/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2752378 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2752378 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/20 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
B65G17/20 (EP,US);
B65G17/38 (US);
B65G19/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2014/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kettenglied einer Förderkette, Förderkette einer Fördervorrichtung und Fördervorrichtung | [2014/28] | English: | Chain link of a conveyor chain, conveyor chain of a conveyor device and conveyor device | [2014/28] | French: | Maillon d'une chaîne à raclettes, chaîne à raclettes d'un dispositif de transport et dispositif de transport | [2014/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 24.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | MT | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | IE | 18.12.2015 | LU | 18.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | BG | 16.12.2015 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
LU | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | BG | 16.12.2015 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
LU | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | BG | 16.12.2015 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | BG | 16.12.2015 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 18.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE20110857U (PEP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8,11* figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2008135088 (JENSEN SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [Y] 3-5 * figures 4-6 *; | [XY]DE202008007100U (PSB INTRALOGISTICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0051] * * figure 7 * [Y] 2-5,8,11; | [Y]EP2363358 (DUERKOPP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * figures 3,6 * | by applicant | DE102010053426 |