EP2750213 - Organic light-emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ji-Youn c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Yoon-Hyun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Park, Bum-Woo c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Sun-Young Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 05 /
Choi, Jong-Won c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 06 /
Choi, Wha-Il c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 07 /
Kim, So-Yeon c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/27] | Application number, filing date | 13199308.1 | 23.12.2013 | [2014/27] | Priority number, date | KR20120155317 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120155317 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2750213 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2750213 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/54, // H01L51/50 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H10K85/636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/633 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/615 (KR,US);
C07D209/82 (KR);
H10K50/11 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/15 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/156 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | H01L51/00, H01L51/54, // H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2014/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Diode | [2014/27] | English: | Organic light-emitting diode | [2014/27] | French: | Diode électroluminescente organique | [2014/27] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2013 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | IE | 23.12.2015 | LU | 23.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2423209 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012119197 (NISHIMURA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* example 16 * |