EP2887156 - Regulator device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Born, Jean-Jacques Rue Louis-de-Savoie 59 1110 Morges / CH | 02 /
Di Domenico, Gianni Avenue du Premier-Mars 33 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
Favre, Jérôme Rue Louis-Favre 17 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
Hinaux, Baptiste Rue du Dr César Roux 23 1005 Lausanne / CH | 05 /
Léchot, Dominique Route de Chaindon 51 2732 Reconvilier / CH | 06 /
Ragot, Patrick Rue du Midi 4 2052 Fontainemelon / CH | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/10] |
Former [2015/26] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13199425.3 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887156 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2887156 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G04C3/10, G04C5/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G04C5/005 (EP,US);
G04C3/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Einstellvorrichtung | [2015/26] | English: | Regulator device | [2015/26] | French: | Dispositif régulateur | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 21.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2013 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | MT | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3208287 (KAZUO ISHIKAWA, et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, lines 35-55 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB698406 (HORSTMANN MAGNETICS LTD, et al) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 69 - page 3, line 51 * * figure 1 * * page 3, lines 52-97 * * figure 2 *; | [A]GB838430 (HORSTMANN MAGNETICS LTD) [A] 1-22 * page 3, lines 16-77 * * page 3, line 114 - page 4, line 10 * * page 4, lines 44-86 * * figures 1-3,6-8 *; | [A]US2750730 (WALTER KOHLHAGEN) [A] 1-22 * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 12 * * figure 11 *; | [A]FR987840 (HORSTMANN MAGNETICS LTD) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 3 * * figure 1 * * page 4, colonne de gauche, avant-dernier alinéa à page 4, colonne de droite, premier alinéa * | by applicant | US276222 |