EP2890155 - Hearing instrument with switchable power supply voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Hearing A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2018/07] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinter, Martin Borgmester Jensens Allé 15, 2. th. 2100 København Ø / DK | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 13199691.0 | 27.12.2013 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890155 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890155 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H03F1/02, H03F3/185 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04R25/305 (EP,US);
H03F1/0255 (EP);
H03F3/185 (EP);
H03F2200/511 (EP);
H04R2225/33 (EP);
H04R2225/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | H04R25/00, H03F3/181, H03G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hörgerät mit schaltbarer Stromversorgungsspannung | [2015/27] | English: | Hearing instrument with switchable power supply voltage | [2015/27] | French: | Instrument auditif avec une tension d'alimentation de puissance commutable | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.12.2013 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.12.2013 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.12.2013 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4115739 (SANO NOBUYA, et al) [I] 1-15* claim 6 *; | [I]US2011068872 (IWAMATSU MASAYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0049] * |