EP2793095 - Diagnosing combinations of failures in a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13275093.6 | 19.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793095 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G05B23/0278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Diagnose von Fehlerkombinationen in einem System | [2014/43] | English: | Diagnosing combinations of failures in a system | [2014/43] | French: | Diagnostic de combinaisons de défaillances dans un système | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/19] | 07.12.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009097435 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * page 2, line 4 - line 33 *; | [AD]WO2009136183 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1,15 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 3 * | [XD] - MOJDEH SHAKERI ET AL, "Optimal and Near-Optimal Algorithms for Multiple Fault Diagnosis with Unreliable Tests", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS: PART C:APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980801), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 1094-6977, XP011057096 [XD] 1,2,14,15 * page 411, column r, paragraph last - page 412, column l, paragraph fourth * * page 413, column l, line 7 - line 10 * * page 435, column r, line last - page 436, column l, line 9 * | [A] - HA MANH TRAN ET AL, Fault Resolution in Case-Based Reasoning, PRICAI 2008: TRENDS IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 417 - 429, (20081215), ISBN 978-3-540-89196-3, XP019111415 [A] 1,15 * page 421, paragraph 2 - page 424, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-89197-0_39 | by applicant | - MOJDEH SHAKERI; KRISHNA R. PATTIPATI, "Optimal and Near-Optimal Algorithms for Multiple Fault Diagnosis with Unreliable Tests", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS-PART C: APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, (199808), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 431 - 440, XP011057096 | - FANG TU; KRISHNA R. PATTIPATI; SOMNATH DEB; VENKATA NARAYANA MALEPATI, "Computationally Efficient Algorithms for Multiple Fault Diagnosis in Large Graph-based Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS-PART A: SYSTEMS AND HUMANS, (200301), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 73 - 85, XP011079899 | - FEILI YU; FANG TU; HAIYING TU; KRISHNA R. PATTIPATI, "A Lagrangian Relaxation Algorithm for Finding the MAP Configuration in QMR-DT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS-PART A: SYSTEMS AND HUMANS, (200709), vol. 37, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/TSMCA.2007.902657, pages 746 - 757, XP011190739 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCA.2007.902657 |