EP2894375 - A gear assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium Limited Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Brown, Alexander Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13275177.7 | 31.07.2013 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894375 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/12, F16H1/22, F16H55/18, // F16D3/64 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
F16H57/12 (EP);
F16H1/22 (EP);
F16H2057/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Getriebeaggregat | [2015/29] | English: | A gear assembly | [2015/29] | French: | Ensemble d'engrenage | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/29] | 01.08.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2006575 (BODET AERO SOC PAR ACTIONS SIM [FR]) [X] 1-6,10,11,15-18 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9 [I] 19; | [XI]GB2218182 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,11,15,16,18 * pages 1-5; figure 5 * [I] 17,19; | [XYI]EP0603453 (MAAG GETRIEBE AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,10-16 * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 24; figures 1-6 * [Y] 7-9 [I] 17-19; | [YA]FR2599454 (MICROBO SA [CH]) [Y] 7-9 * page 11, lines 16-32; figures 10,11 * [A] 1; | [A]DE102011001931 (KENDRION LINNIG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102008009122 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]GB215082 (PETER MAURICE STAUNTON) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |