EP2755350 - Apparatus for performing clock and/or data recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pöhlmann, Wolfgang Alte Schöckinger Strasse 11 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 02 /
Suikat, Detlef Masshodlerweg 13 75395 Ostelsheim / DE | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13290008.5 | 15.01.2013 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2755350 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/033, H03L7/081, // H04J3/04 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H03L7/081 (EP);
H03L7/091 (EP);
H03L7/0996 (EP);
H04L7/0337 (EP);
H04J3/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ausführung von Takt- und/oder Daten-Rückgewinnung | [2014/29] | English: | Apparatus for performing clock and/or data recovery | [2014/29] | French: | Dispositif de récupération d'horloge et/ou de données | [2014/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 17.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5734283 (HEDBERG MATS OLOF JOAKIM [SE]) [X] 1-6,10-13 * column 1, line 36 - line 44 * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 11 * * column 8, line 5 - line 20 * * figures 3,3a,5 * [I] 7-9; | [I]EP1239627 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [I] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] *; | [A]US4926447 (CORSETTO CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 5, line 11 - line 36; figures 2a,20a * | [XI] - HU T H ET AL, "A MONOLITHIC 480 MB/S PARALLEL AGC/DECISION/COCK-RECOVERY CIRCUIT IN 1.2- M CMOS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19931201), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1109/4.262005, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1314 - 1320, XP000435905 [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * page 1314, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 1315, column r, paragraph 4 * * abstract * * page 1317, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1318, column l, paragraph 1 * [I] 4,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.262005 |