EP2832622 - Method and devices for monitoring the correct rerailing of a guided vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 40 avenue des Fruitiers 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2015/25] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Consoli, Luciano 70 rue Dutot F-75015 Paris / FR | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13290178.6 | 29.07.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832622 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2832622 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B61F9/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B61F9/005 (EP,US);
B61L1/04 (US);
B61F9/00 (RU,US);
B61L15/00 (US);
B61L23/00 (US);
H01H15/06 (EP,US);
H01H21/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtungen zur Kontrolle der korrekten Aufgleisung eines spurgeführten Fahrzeugs | [2015/06] | English: | Method and devices for monitoring the correct rerailing of a guided vehicle | [2015/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositifs de contrôle d'un enraillement correct d'un véhicle guidé | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 11.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2013 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IS | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | MT | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | IE | 29.07.2016 | LU | 29.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1614602 (SCHENCK PROCESS GMBH [DE]) [A] 10,12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0030]; figures 1-9; claims 11,12 *; | [AD]WO2011012176 (SIEMENS SAS [FR], et al) [AD] 1-5 * page 14, paragraph 5 - page 17, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6029579 | US6363860 | US7228803 | WO2008074942 | US2010065692 | WO2010102676 | WO2011012176 |