EP2843129 - REINFORCED GYPSUM BOARD HAVING IMPROVED FIRE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN PLACO Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Placo SAS 34 Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lelogeay, Sophie Derriere Grumeau 73310 Ontex / FR | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2015/10] | Pugsley, Victoria Antonietta chapman+co 18 Staple Gardens Winchester SO23 8SR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13290205.7 | 30.08.2013 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843129 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843129 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2843129 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | [2020/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2843129 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D21H13/40, E04C2/04 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
D21H13/40 (EP,KR,RU);
B32B13/02 (RU,US);
D21H21/24 (KR);
B32B17/04 (US);
D03D1/00 (KR);
D03D15/267 (KR);
E04B1/942 (KR);
E04C2/043 (EP,KR,RU);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/101 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verstärkte Gipsplatte mit verbesserter Feuerbeständigkeit | [2023/01] | English: | REINFORCED GYPSUM BOARD HAVING IMPROVED FIRE RESISTANCE | [2015/10] | French: | Plaque de plâtre renforcée disposant d'une résistance au feu améliorée | [2023/01] |
Former [2015/10] | Verstärkte Gipsplatte mit verbesserter Feuerbeständigkeit | ||
Former [2015/10] | Plaque de plâtre renforcée disposant d'une résistance au feu améliorée | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.2021
01.09.2022
WITHDRAWN Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC 2790 Columbus Road Route 16 Granville OH 43023 / US Opponent's representative Lawrie IP Limited 10 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.2021
01.09.2022
WITHDRAWN Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC 2790 Columbus Road Route 16 Granville OH 43023 / US Opponent's representative Lawrie IP Limited 310 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5RG / GB | ||
Former [2021/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.2021
17.02.2021
ADMISSIBLE Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC 2790 Columbus Road Route 16 Granville OH 43023 / US Opponent's representative Lawrie IP Limited 310 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5RG / GB | 08.03.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.05.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2013 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IE | 30.08.2020 | LU | 30.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.08.2013 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
LU | 30.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004094743 (GEORGIA PACIFIC GYPSUM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9,12-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2008008868 (BUILDING MATERIALS INVEST CORP [US], et al) [X] 5,12-15 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 3 * * page 8, lines 1-16; table 1 * * page 10, lines 10-12 *; | [X]WO2010019338 (SAINT GOBAIN TECHNICAL FABRICS [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 32] - [0041] - [0 45] , [0 47] , [0 50] , [0 51] , [0 54] - [0055] - [0 65] - [0066]; figures 8,9; example A; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2010106444 (LAFARGE GYPSUM INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-9,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4378405 | US6524679 | Opposition | JP2001020165 | US2006068186 | US2007298235 | WO2008150647 | US2009029141 | US2009208714 | EP2230075 | WO2010141190 | US2008176050 | WO2014141190 | - PARK JC et al., "Electrospun poly(vinyl alcohol) nanofibers: effects of degree of hydrolysis and enhanced water stability", Polymer Journal, (20100000), vol. 42, pages 273 - 276, XP055780064 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/pj.2009.340 | - Dow, "AQUASET™ TF-150 - Acrylic Binder for Nonwovens", Technical Data Sheet, (20110100), pages 1 - 2, XP055780094 | - "Polycarboxylate", URL: https://www.biesterfeld.com/en/it/product/polycarboxylate | - "Acronal® Acrylic Binders", URL: https://www.basf.com/us/en/products/General-Business-Topics/dispersions/Products/acronal1.html | - LEE et al., "Nanotribological Effect of Water Layers Intercalated between Exfoliated MoS2 and Mica", J. Phys. Chem. C, (20200000), vol. 124, pages 16902 - 16907, XP055780176 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jpcc.0c01848 | - PARK JC et al., "Electrospun poly(vinyl alcohol) nanofibers: effects of degree of hydrolysis and enhanced water stability", Polymer Journal, (20100000), vol. 42, pages 273 - 276 | - U.S. Geological Survey - Mica Statistics and Information(https://www.usgs.gov/centers/nmic/mica-statistics-and-information) | - Dow, "AQUASET™ TF-150 - Acrylic Binder for Nonwovens", Technical Data Sheet, (20110100), pages 1 - 2 | - Acronal - Acrylic binders for architectural coatings(https://www.basf.com/us/en/products/General-Business-Topics/dispersions/Products/acronaH.html) | - Acronal - Acrylic binders for construction products(https://www.basf.com/us/en/products/General-Business-Topics/dispersions/Products/acronall.html) | - Acronal - Acrylic binders for industrial coatings(https://www.basf.com/us/en/products/General-Business-Topics/disoersions/Products/acronaH.html) | - LEE et al., "Nanotribological Effect of Water Layers Intercalated between Exfoliated MoS2 and Mica", J. Phys. Chem. C, (20200000), vol. 124, pages 16902 - 16907 |