EP2669006 - Method for preparing a catalyst using a quick-drying step, the catalyst being useable in Fischer-Tropsch synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/49] | Method for preparing a catalyst using a quick-drying step and use of said catalyst in Fischer-Tropsch synthesis | ||
[2017/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states Eni S.p.a. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Rome / IT | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Eni S.p.a. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Rome / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURY, Sylvie 0356 CHE DE BRIOLES 69440 SAINT MAURICE D'ARGOIRE / FR | 02 /
DIEHL, Fabrice 0009 T RUE DE MONTBRILLANT 69003 LYON / FR | 03 /
BERLIET, Adrien 0008 IMP DE LA LOGE 69004 LYON / FR | 04 /
LOPEZ, Joseph 0308 CHE DE GRANAUDY 30340 SAINT JULIEN LES ROSIERS / FR | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13305440.3 | 05.04.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | FR20120001543 | 30.05.2012 Original published format: FR 1201543 | [2013/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669006 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2669006 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/74, B01J23/75, B01J23/46, B01J23/89, B01J35/00, B01J23/00, B01J37/02, B01J37/18, B01J37/08, B01J21/04, B01J21/06, B01J21/12, C10G2/00 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J23/74 (EP,US);
B01J23/745 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/392 (EP,US);
B01J35/393 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/0205 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,US);
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
C10G2/332 (EP,US);
C10G2/333 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2013/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Katalysators, bei dem eine Schnelltrocknungsphase eingesetzt wird, wobei den Katalysator bei der Fischer-Tropsch-Synthese anwendbar ist. | [2017/51] | English: | Method for preparing a catalyst using a quick-drying step, the catalyst being useable in Fischer-Tropsch synthesis | [2017/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur mettant en oeuvre une étape de séchage rapide, le catalyseur étant utilisable pour la synthèse Fischer-Tropsch | [2017/51] |
Former [2013/49] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Katalysators, bei dem eine Schnelltrocknungsphase eingesetzt wird, und dessen Verwendung für die Fischer-Tropsch-Synthese | ||
Former [2013/49] | Method for preparing a catalyst using a quick-drying step and use of said catalyst in Fischer-Tropsch synthesis | ||
Former [2013/49] | Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur mettant en oeuvre une étape de séchage rapide et utilisation dudit catalyseur pour la synthèse Fischer-Tropsch | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2013 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | MT | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03012008 (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 6, lines 11-15 * * example - ** claim - *; | [I]US2005234137 (ESPINOZA RAFAEL L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0051] , [0056] , [0107] , [0138] - [0149] - [0228] - [0235] *; | [I]EP2407237 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0023] , [0034] - [0038] - [0043] * * example - * * figure - *; | [X]WO2012020210 (GTL F1 AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] * * examples 3-9 * * claims 1,15,16 * | by applicant | US6806226 | WO2007071899 | - BEZEMER, "Cobalt particle size effects in the Fischer-Tropsch reaction studied with carbon nanofiber supported cobalt", JACS, (2006), vol. 128, doi:doi:10.1021/ja058282w, page 3956, XP055260514 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja058282w | - BARTHOLOMEW, "Thé stoechiometrics of H2 and CO adsorptions on Cobalt : effects of support and preparation", J. CATAL, (1984), vol. 85, pages 63 - 77 |