EP2809077 - Method and apparatus for classification of a file [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamphenkel, Oliver Schlaegelweg 21 31275 Lehrte / DE | 02 /
Brune, Thomas Konkordiastr. 15 30449 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Freimann, Achim Heinrich-Heine-Str. 58 30173 Hannover / DE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 13305690.3 | 27.05.2013 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809077 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/84, G11B27/19, G06F17/30 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F16/116 (EP,US);
G06F16/13 (EP,US);
G06F16/783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Klassifizierung einer Datei | [2014/49] | English: | Method and apparatus for classification of a file | [2014/49] | French: | Procédé et appareil de classification d'un fichier | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 04.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1496701 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1,3-8 * figures 4, 8 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0067] *; | [I]US2010042650 (ROENNING JEFF [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * figures 29, 32, 33 * * paragraphs [0112] , [ 120] *; | [A]US2011087703 (VARADARAJAN SRIDHAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document * |