EP2868632 - Method for the inactivation of virginiamycin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Da Volterra 172 Rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Gunzburg, Jean Elmfield House 1A Neville Terrace London, SW7 3AT / GB | 02 /
Couillerot, Olivier 41 rue de la Folie Regnault 75011 PARIS / FR | 03 /
Bandinelli, Pierre-Alain 1 rue Dollé 77440 Mary sur Marne / FR | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Sekhri, Redha, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13306504.5 | 31.10.2013 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868632 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/34, // C02F103/20, C02F103/34 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
C02F3/342 (EP);
C02F2103/003 (EP);
C02F2103/20 (EP);
C02F2103/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Deaktivierung von Virginiamycin | [2015/19] | English: | Method for the inactivation of virginiamycin | [2015/19] | French: | Procédé pour l'inactivation de virginiamycine | [2015/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 07.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2012007536 (DA VOLTERRA [FR], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 20, line 9 - page 21, line 21 *; | [A] - RAMASAMY TAJAESH KUMAR, "Fate, Occurrence, and Toxicity of Veterinary Antibiotics in Environment", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN SOCIETY FOR APPLIED BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 55, pages 701 - 709, XP002723291 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13765-012-2220-4 | by applicant | WO2011046967 | WO2012007536 | - BALDRIAN, P., "Fungal laccases - occurrences and properties", FEMS MICROBIOL REV, (2006), vol. 30, pages 215 - 242 | - COUTO, SR; HERRERA, JLT, "Industrial and biotechnological applications of laccases: a review", BIOTECHNOL ADV, (2006), vol. 24, pages 500 - 513 | - MAYER, A. M.; STAPLES, R. C., "Laccase: new functions for an old enzyme", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 60, pages 551 - 565 | - THURSTON, C., "The structure and function of fungal laccases", MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 140, page 19 | - TORRES, E.; BUSTOS-JAIMES, 1.; LE BORGNE, S., "Potential use of oxidative enzymes for the detoxification of organic pollutants", APPLIED CATALYSIS B, (2003), vol. 46, pages 1 - 15 |