EP2882115 - Method and system of monitoring the power level of optical signals in an optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuis, Nicolas Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | 02 /
Meersman, Stijn Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 13306659.7 | 03.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882115 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/079 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/07955 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Überwachung des Leistungspegels von optischen Signalen in einem optischen Netzwerk | [2015/24] | English: | Method and system of monitoring the power level of optical signals in an optical network | [2015/24] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de surveiller le niveau de puissance de signaux optique dans un réseau optique | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2009269053 (YANG SULIN [CN]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] * [A] 5-11 [I] 3,4; | [XAI]US2010098413 (LI WEIDONG RICK [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0085] * [A] 5-11 [I] 3,4; | [A]EP2579480 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0045] * * figures 1,4 * |