EP2887449 - Tunable cavity filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Templ, Wolfgang Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Wiegner, Dirk Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Huber, Meik, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property Business Group Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 13306741.3 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887449 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/205, H01P1/208, H01P7/06, H01P7/04 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H01P1/2053 (EP);
H01P1/208 (EP);
H01P7/04 (EP);
H01P7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abstimmbarer Hohlraumfilter | [2015/26] | English: | Tunable cavity filter | [2015/26] | French: | Filtre à cavité accordable | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3471811 (KLOTZ ROBERT E) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,11-14 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]US2010007442 (NARHI HARRI [FI]) [X] 1-6,9-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 3a,3b,4 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2004212457 (EDEN RICHARD C [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035]; figures 1a, 1b *; | [Y]US2010127953 (WIK DANIEL [SE]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0018]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP2555322 (DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1a,1b *; | [A]US8598969 (WALKER ANDERS P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 58; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - DUBOIS P ET AL, "Voltage Control of the Resonance Frequency of Dielectric Electroactive Polymer (DEAP) Membranes", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (20081001), vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2008.927741, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 1072 - 1081, XP011231987 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2008.927741 |