EP2886848 - Torque transmission mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41 550 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chambonneau, M Charles 27, rue des Oliviers 37300 JOUE LES TOURS / FR | 02 /
Berruet, Nicolas 25 route de Ballan 37260 Artannes sur Indre / FR | 03 /
Champalou, François 6 route de Vesnon 41150 CHAUMONT SUR LOIRE / FR | 04 /
Ribault, Patrice 75 rue de la Vallée de Nouy 37210 VOUVRAY / FR | 05 /
Liverato, Yves-André Les Petites Gaudières 37370 St PATERNE RACAN / FR | 06 /
Corbett, Richard 11, rue du Verger 37230 FONDETTES / FR | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69003 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69003 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 13306845.2 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886848 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02N15/02, F16D41/064 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
F02N15/023 (EP,CN,US);
F02N15/006 (US);
F16D41/07 (US);
F16D41/069 (EP,US);
Y10T74/134 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmomentübertragungsmechanismus | [2015/26] | English: | Torque transmission mechanism | [2015/26] | French: | Mécanisme de transmission de couple | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]WO2007148228 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044] - [0 48] - [5469] - [0074]; figures 1-5, 9a, 9b * [A] 3 [I] 4-8,10-12; | [XI]DE102007043897 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032]; figures 1,2 * [I] 6-8; | [I]WO2010028510 (MAGNA POWERTRAIN USA INC [CA], et al) [I] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] - [0035] - [0 46] - [0049]; figures 1-5 *; | [IA]WO2010028511 (MAGNA POWERTRAIN USA INC [CA], et al) [I] 1,2,6-8 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032]; figures 1,2,3,5 *[A] 4,5,9-12; | [XI]WO2010130058 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] - [0055] - [0057] - [0062] - [0065]; figures 2,3,11 * [I] 4-8; | [I]US2011252902 (SUZUKI YUKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2007148228 |