EP2889668 - A method of determining an optical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boiffier, Maxime C/O Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-pont / FR | 02 /
Callier, Benoit C/O Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | 03 /
Reignault, Marc C/O Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-pont / FR | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Huisman, Aurélien Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Huisman, Aurélien Cabinet Novitech 9 rue Pasteur 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | Application number, filing date | 13306867.6 | 26.12.2013 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889668 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02C11/00, G02C7/08 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP);
G02B2027/0196 (EP);
G02C11/10 (EP);
G02C7/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer optischen Ausrüstung | [2015/27] | English: | A method of determining an optical equipment | [2015/27] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer un équipement optique | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 26.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 28.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0055676 (MICROOPTICAL CORP [US]) [A] 11 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 18 *; | [I]FR2866442 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [I] 1,5-7 * figures 2, 4, 5 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 17 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 31 * * page 7, line 5 - line 8 * * page 9, line 23 - line 28 *; | [I]WO2008003903 (ESSILOR INT [FR], et al) [I] 1,2,5,8-10 * figures 2, 4 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 17 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 17 * * page 8, line 21 - page 13, line 9 *; | [A]US2010110368 (CHAUM DAVID [US]) [A] 12* paragraphs [0086] - [0088] - [ 0093] - [0095]; figure 6E *; | [X]US2010171922 (SESSNER RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13 * figures 4b, 6b, 18 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0004] - [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0012] , [0014] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0032] , [0035] , [0043] - [0050] - [0053] , [0066] , [0095] * * paragraphs [0165] , [ 0169] , [ 0181] , [ 0205] , [ 0208] , [ 0209] , [ 0222] *; | [I]EP2372431 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6 * figures 4, 8, 15 * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0022] , [ 0063] - [0065] - [ 0070] - [0073] - [ 0081] - [0083] * * paragraphs [0114] , [ 0117] , [ 0118] , [ 0120] * | by applicant | US7857444 |