EP2781730 - Compact device for exhaust gas management in an EGR system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez Tabarés, Iago Reza 12, 3º D 32003 Ourense / ES | 02 /
Hermida Dominguez, Xoan Xosé Urb. San Benito 18 36380 Gondomar - Pontevedra / ES | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13382096.9 | 19.03.2013 | [2014/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781730 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
F01N13/1838 (EP,US);
F01N3/0205 (EP,US);
F01N3/021 (EP,US);
F02M26/15 (EP,US);
F02M26/25 (EP,US);
F02M26/26 (EP,US);
F02M26/30 (EP,US);
F02M26/32 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kompakte Vorrichtung zur Abgasverwaltung in einem AGR-System | [2014/39] | English: | Compact device for exhaust gas management in an EGR system | [2014/39] | French: | Dispositif compact pour gestion de gaz d'échappement dans un système EGR | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 25.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5205265 (KASHIYAMA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2194351 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2354520 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010313858 (SPRINGER MORITZ KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2923535 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |