EP2659832 - Capacitive sensor made of fabric for measuring human movements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univisio Oy Teollisuustie 4 38800 Jämijärvi / FI | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korhonen, Aki Teräskatu 7 B 48 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Vanhala, Jukka Karhukehrääjä 10 33960 Pirkkala / FI | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 13397508.6 | 11.04.2013 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | FI20120005472 | 30.04.2012 Original published format: FI 20125472 | FI20120005473 | 30.04.2012 Original published format: FI 20125473 | [2013/45] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659832 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/11 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A61B5/6892 (EP);
A61B5/1115 (EP);
A61B2562/0214 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Sensor aus Stoff zum Messen menschlicher Bewegungen | [2013/45] | English: | Capacitive sensor made of fabric for measuring human movements | [2013/45] | French: | Capteur capacitif constitué de tissu permettant de mesurer des mouvements humains | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006224089 (TAN KWONG L [SG], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,15 * figures 3, 5, 6 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * claim 11 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * [Y] 5 [I] 12-14; | [YA]US2006264785 (DRING BARTON [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * [A] 1,7,8; | [A]EP1769975 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,6-8,10-13 * figures 2, 4 * * column 4, line 50 - line 58 *; | [A]US5010772 (BOURLAND JOE D [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,12-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]US4526043 (BOIE ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,6-8,10,11 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 2 - line 28 * * column 4, line 65 - line 67 * | by applicant | US3926177 |