EP2712526 - Cooking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sillmen, Ulrich Eggestr. 76 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2014/14] | Application number, filing date | 13401097.4 | 29.08.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | DE201210109204 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012109204 | [2014/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712526 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/024, F24C7/08 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
A47J27/002 (EP);
A47J36/321 (EP);
F24C7/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Garsystem | [2014/14] | English: | Cooking system | [2014/14] | French: | Système de cuisson | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 03.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2333617 (THERMO ELECTRON CORP) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 2; claim 13 * * page 8, line 14 - line 20 * [I] 9; | [A]DE534596 (WILHELM PFEIFFER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 8 - line 28; figure - *; | [A]US4660542 (SCHERER RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3050801 (FISSLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2094059 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006]; figure - * |