EP2807615 - AUTOMATIC CONFIGURATION OF A PRODUCT DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIELOK, Andreas Steinbachtal 53b 97082 Würzburg / DE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Baldus, Oliver Patentanwälte Schwarz & Baldus Hermann-Schmidstr. 10 80336 München / DE | [2014/49] | Application number, filing date | 13701111.0 | 25.01.2013 | WO2013EP51449 | Priority number, date | DE20121001406 | 26.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012001406 | US201261590855P | 26.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261590855 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013110767 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807615 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/35 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE KONFIGURATION EINES PRODUKTDATENVERWALTUNGSSYSTEMS | [2014/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC CONFIGURATION OF A PRODUCT DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2014/49] | French: | CONFIGURATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DONNÉES DE PRODUITS | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 04.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 24.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005097449 (LUMERA JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010332535 (WEIZMAN YORAM [IL], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011029535 (COLE PATRICK L [US]) [X] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US2011179110 (SOLOWAY MARK GRANT [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 1 - page 17 * |