EP2705360 - RUN-THROUGH COIL ARRANGEMENT, MEASURING APPARATUS WITH RUN-THROUGH COIL ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING MEASURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/11] | THROUGH-COIL ARRANGEMENT, TEST APPARATUS WITH THROUGH-COIL ARRANGEMENT AND TESTING METHOD | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Dr. Foerster GmbH & Co. KG In Laisen 70 72766 Reutlingen / DE | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖCKER, Matthias Johannes-Eisenlohr-Straße 160 72760 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
HADITSCH, Franz Marienstraße 3/2 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Stefan An der Seite 13 72406 Bisingen / DE | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2014/11] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstraße 30 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13701389.2 | 11.01.2013 | [2017/26] | WO2013EP50470 | Priority number, date | DE201210202800 | 23.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012202800 | EP20120195748 | 05.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195748 | [2014/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124087 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705360 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705360 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/9026 (EP,KR,US);
G01N27/9006 (KR,US);
G01N27/904 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHLAUFSPULENANORDNUNG, PRÜFVORRICHTUNG MIT DURCHLAUFSPULENANORDNUNG UND PRÜFVERFAHREN | [2014/11] | English: | RUN-THROUGH COIL ARRANGEMENT, MEASURING APPARATUS WITH RUN-THROUGH COIL ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING MEASURING METHOD | [2016/51] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BOBINES A PASSAGE TRAVERSANT, APPAREIL DE MESURE AVEC AGENCEMENT DE BOBINES A PASSAGE TRAVERSANT ET PROCEDE DE MESURE | [2016/51] |
Former [2014/11] | THROUGH-COIL ARRANGEMENT, TEST APPARATUS WITH THROUGH-COIL ARRANGEMENT AND TESTING METHOD | ||
Former [2014/11] | AGENCEMENT DE BOBINE DE PASSAGE, DISPOSITIF D'ESSAI COMPRENANT UN AGENCEMENT DE BOBINE DE PASSAGE ET MÉTHODE D'ESSAI | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2013 | AL | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | IE | 11.01.2018 | LU | 11.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10135660 (BENTELER STAHL ROHR GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE8012257U (FOERSTER INST DR FRIEDRICH) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 1 *; | [A]AT502976 (UNIV GRAZ TECH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4438171 (FOERSTER INST DR FRIEDRICH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]GB516753 (SPERRY PROD INC) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 59-109; figures 5-10 *; | [A]US2007205764 (KRONER GARY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10135660 | DE4438171 |