EP2809765 - STABLE, VISCOUS, PEROXIDE CONTAINING LAVATORY TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser LLC Morris Corporate Center IV 399 Interpace Parkway Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POST, Sarah Marie 5E Kensington Circle Garnerville, New York 10923 / US | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 13702094.7 | 24.01.2013 | WO2013GB50145 | Priority number, date | US201261592071P | 30.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261592071 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114079 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809765 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D1/94, C11D3/04, C11D3/33, C11D3/34, C11D1/90, C11D1/29, C11D1/22 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D3/48 (US);
C11D3/042 (EP,US);
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
C11D3/3409 (EP,US);
C11D3/3418 (EP,US);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | STABILE VISKOSE PEROXIDHALTIGE TOILETTENBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/50] | English: | STABLE, VISCOUS, PEROXIDE CONTAINING LAVATORY TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS | [2014/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE TOILETTES, VISQUEUSES, STABLES, CONTENANT DU PEROXYDE | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0962520 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6,12,17 * * example - ** page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 18 *; | [XI]WO03080782 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * example - * * page 1, line 10 - line 19 * * page 3, line 26 - line 28 * [I] 9; | [I]WO2011017406 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,7-9 * claim - * * example - * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 2 * * page 11, line 30 - page 13, line 25 *; | [A] - S. Herrwerth et al., "Highly Concentrated Cocamidopropyl Betaine- The Latest Developments for Improved Sustainability and Enhanced Skin Care", Tenside Surfactants Detergents, Munich, vol. 45, no. 6, (2008), pages 304 - 308, URL: http://personal-care.evonik.com/product/personal-care/en/media-center/downloads/publications/Documents/tenside-tego-betain-c-60.pdf, (20130326), XP002694541 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3139/113.100387 | by applicant | US2798053 | US3915921 | US4203877 | US4421902 | US4509949 | US4923940 | US4996274 | US5004598 | US5266690 | US5349030 | US5977053 | - Official Methods of Analysis, ASSOCIATION OF OFFICIAL ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS | - "Germicidal and Detergent Sanitizing Action of Disinfectants", Official Methods of Analysis, ASSOCIATION OF OFFICIAL ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS |