EP2815250 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE DEVICE HAVING AN ULTRASONIC SENSOR, MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ULTRASONIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILL, Anton Krebserweg 7 74348 Lauffen a. N. / DE | 02 /
ZUTHER, Sebastian Moltkestr. 19 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 13702450.1 | 01.02.2013 | WO2013EP52024 | Priority number, date | DE20121002979 | 15.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002979 | [2014/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013120706 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815250 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01K7/20 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G01S7/52006 (EP,CN);
G01K7/32 (EP,CN);
G01K2205/00 (EP,CN);
G01K2217/00 (EP,CN);
G01S15/876 (EP,CN);
G01S2015/932 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZEINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM ULTRASCHALLSENSOR, KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ULTRASCHALLSENSORS | [2014/52] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE DEVICE HAVING AN ULTRASONIC SENSOR, MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ULTRASONIC SENSOR | [2014/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN CAPTEUR D'ULTRASONS, VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN CAPTEUR D'ULTRASONS | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 05.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1904853 (ANVAR) [X] 11 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 19 * * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 24 * [I] 1,10; | [A]EP1150135 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,11* the whole document *; | [XI]EP2290343 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,9 |