EP2812595 - PAD RETENTION SYSTEM OF A DISC BRAKE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGARTNER, Johann Thonstetten 35 85368 Moosburg / DE | 02 /
PESCHEL, Michael Gisostr. 1 82296 Schöngeising / DE | 03 /
WERTH, Alexander Lauthstr. 60 80999 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13703040.9 | 06.02.2013 | [2022/01] | WO2013EP52276 | Priority number, date | DE20121002734 | 10.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002734 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013117561 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2812595 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812595 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/226, F16D65/097 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
F16D65/0978 (EP,US);
F16D55/02 (RU,US);
F16D55/226 (EP,RU,US);
F16D65/0976 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELAGHALTESYSTEM EINER SCHEIBENBREMSE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2014/51] | English: | PAD RETENTION SYSTEM OF A DISC BRAKE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RETENUE DE GARNITURE D'UN FREIN À DISQUE D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 13.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | IE | 06.02.2022 | LU | 06.02.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NO | 05.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR1492833 (DBA SA) [X] 1,2,8 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 * [I] 4-7; | [XAI]DE19953159 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 8, lines 29-43; figures 4-6 * [A] 3 [I] 5-7; | [XAI]US6305506 (SHIRAI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 38, line 63 - column 39, line 29; figures 11,12 * [A] 3 [I] 5-7; | [XAI]EP2213900 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0045]; figure 3a * [A] 3[I] 4,6,7 |