EP2647132 - Reducing network acquisition time in the presence of interference [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | REDUCING NETWORK ACQUISITION TIME IN THE PRESENCE OF INTERFERENCE | ||
[2014/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIPATHI, Prashant Udupa 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SUBRAHMANYA, Parvathanathan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Skrba, Sinéad, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2013/41] | Application number, filing date | 13703205.8 | 18.01.2013 | WO2013US22256 | Priority number, date | US201261597674P | 10.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261597674 P | US201213669559 | 06.11.2012 Original published format: US201213669559 | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119376 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647132 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2647132 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7097, H04K3/00, H04J11/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H04J11/0023 (EP,US);
H04J11/0069 (KR);
H04J2211/005 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verminderung einer Netzwerkerfassungszeit im Fall von Störungen | [2014/08] | English: | Reducing network acquisition time in the presence of interference | [2014/08] | French: | Diminution du temps d'acquisition de réseau en présence d'interférences | [2014/08] |
Former [2013/41] | VERMINDERUNG EINER NETZWERKERFASSUNGSZEIT IM FALL VON STÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [2013/41] | REDUCING NETWORK ACQUISITION TIME IN THE PRESENCE OF INTERFERENCE | ||
Former [2013/41] | DIMINUTION DU TEMPS D'ACQUISITION DE RÉSEAU EN PRÉSENCE D'INTERFÉRENCES | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 21.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2013 | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | IE | 18.01.2015 | LU | 18.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004086654 (UTSTARCOM KOREA LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-60 * page 10, line 1 - line 7 *; | [IP]WO2013006653 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [IP] 33-60 * paragraph [[0054]] - paragraph [[0056]] * | by applicant | WO2004086654 |