EP2802443 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING FOAM PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 915 East 32nd Street Holland, MI 49423 / US | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCEVOY, James Thomas 2250 Karen Drive Howell, Michigan 48855 / US | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13703485.6 | 09.01.2013 | WO2013US20771 | Priority number, date | US201261586578P | 13.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261586578 P | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013106391 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2802443 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/12, B29C33/60, B29C35/08, B29K75/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
B29C33/60 (EP,US);
B29C44/3415 (US);
B29C35/0888 (EP,US);
B29C44/12 (US);
B29C44/1285 (EP,US);
B29C44/58 (US);
B29C67/246 (EP,US);
C08G18/06 (US);
B29C2035/0811 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0861 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (US);
B29K2505/00 (US);
B29K2701/12 (US);
B29K2827/18 (US);
B29K2901/12 (US);
B29K2995/0027 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHAUMSTOFFTEILEN | [2014/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING FOAM PARTS | [2014/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE PIÈCES EN MOUSSE | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5397225 (KNIPP HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, lines 5-18 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 4 * * column 5, lines 5-55 *; | [A]DE19503240 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 10,11 * column 1, lines 3-5 ** column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 11 *; | [XYI]DE10009665 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-9,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0013] - [0026] , [0027] , [0038] , [0039] , [0045] , [0052] , [0055] - [0058] - [0068] * [Y] 13 [I] 10,11; | [Y]EP1177880 (RECTICEL [BE]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figures 6,7 *; | [I]US2003164562 (LI HONGWEN [US], et al) [I] 1-10,12,14-16 * paragraphs [1.22] , [0024] - [0026] - [0028] - [0030] - [0033]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003230817 (CROOK RUSSELL A [US]) [X] 1,3-9,14-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0013] - [0015] - [0026]; figure 1 * |