EP2805416 - ON-CHIP COARSE DELAY CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wilson J. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
TAN, Chiew-Guan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Wimmer, Hubert Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Wimmer, Hubert WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13704267.7 | 17.01.2013 | WO2013US21836 | Priority number, date | US201261587705P | 18.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261587705 P | US201213368906 | 08.02.2012 Original published format: US201213368906 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013109688 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805416 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/13 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H03K5/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | GROBE ON-CHIP-VERZÖGERUNGSKALIBRATION | [2014/48] | English: | ON-CHIP COARSE DELAY CALIBRATION | [2014/48] | French: | RÉGLAGE APPROCHÉ DU RETARD SUR PUCE | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006055574 (MAKSIMOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,11,12,15-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0034] , [0056] , [0057] , [0060] , [0065] , [0068] , [0069] , [0072]; figures 1,7,8,9,11,12 *; | [XY]US2006273831 (MAKSIMOVIC DRAGAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11,12,15,16,18-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,10,14; | [XY]US2008238752 (SHIMIZU KAZUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13,15-20 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0043] , [0050] , [0052] , [0053] , [0059] , [0063] , [0068] , [0069] , [0077] , [0078] , [0080]; figures 4,7a,7c,7d,8a,9a,9b,12,13a,13b * [Y] 5,6,10,14; | [X]JP2011169594 (ADVANTEST CORP) [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11-13,15-20* abstract * | Examination | US7750706 | WO2009150816 |