EP2814587 - FC-RECEPTOR BASED AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALKENSTEIN, Roberto Wastl-Witt-Strasse 5 80689 Muenchen / DE | 02 /
HERTENBERGER, Hubert Muenchener Strasse 37a 82362 Weilheim / DE | 03 /
RUEGER, Petra Auf der Leiten 4 82377 Penzberg / DE | 04 /
SCHLOTHAUER, Tilman Sommerstrasse 3a 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13704599.3 | 14.02.2013 | [2018/18] | WO2013EP52932 | Priority number, date | EP20120155630 | 15.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12155630 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013120929 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814587 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814587 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/38, C07K1/22, C07K16/06 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
C07K1/22 (EP,RU,US);
B01D15/168 (EP,RU,US);
B01D15/3809 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/289 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/3206 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/3219 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/3274 (EP,RU,US);
B01J39/26 (RU,US);
C07K14/70535 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP);
C07K16/065 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/6854 (RU,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAPHIE AUF FC-REZEPTOR-BASIS | [2014/52] | English: | FC-RECEPTOR BASED AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2014/52] | French: | CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'AFFINITÉ FAISANT APPEL À DES RÉCEPTEURS FC | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2013 | AL | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.02.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [IDAY]WO2005047327 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-10,14-18 * the whole document, in particular page 26, lines 18-20; page 101, lines 3-13; examples 5 and 6; claims 44-50, 53-54 * [A] 12,19-36 [Y] 1,2,11,13,16,17; | [AD]WO2010048313 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-36* the whole document *; | [IA] - HUBER A H ET AL, "Crystallization and Stoichiometry of Binding of a Complex between a Rat Intestinal Fc Receptor and Fc", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 230, no. 3, doi:10.1006/JMBI.1993.1220, ISSN 0022-2836, (19930405), pages 1077 - 1083, (19930405), XP024009407 [I] 1,3-10 * the whole document, in particular abstract; page 1078, column 1, lines 34-37; page 1079, column 2, line 13 to page 1080, column 2, line 10; figure 3 * [A] 2,11-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1993.1220 | [Y] - JOSIC D ET AL, "Analytical and preparative methods for purification of antibodies", FOOD TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SVEUCILISTE U ZAGREBU * PREHRAMBENO-BIOTEHNOLOSKI FAKULTET, CROATIA, (20010101), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 1330-9862, pages 215 - 226, XP002357256 [Y] 1,2,13,16,17 * the whole document, in particular page 221, column 2, lines 4-25; figure 10 * | [Y] - ROOPENIAN DERRY C ET AL, "FcRn: the neonatal Fc receptor comes of age", NATURE REVIEWS. IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20070901), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.1038/NRI2155, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 715 - 725, XP002510057 [Y] 1,2,11,13,16,17 * the whole document, in particular page 715, column 2, lines 10-12; page 720, column 2, lines 8-19; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRI2155 | [IY] - PAN HAI ET AL, "Methionine oxidation in human IgG2 Fc decreases binding affinities to protein A and FcRn", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1002/PRO.45, ISSN 0961-8368, (20090201), pages 424 - 433, (20081229), XP009143092 [I] 12 * the whole document, in particular abstract; paragraph spanning pages 427 and 428; paragraph spanning pages 430 and 431; figure 4; table I * [Y] 1,2,13,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pro.45 | [AD] - GIOVANNI MAGISTRELLI ET AL, "Robust recombinant FcRn production in mammalian cells enabling oriented immobilization for IgG binding studies", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (20120101), vol. 375, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.jim.2011.09.002, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 20 - 29, XP055032388 [AD] 1-36 * the whole document, in particular abstract; section 3.1 on page 23; paragraph spanning pages 25 and 26; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2011.09.002 | by applicant | US4676980 | US4737456 | US4816567 | EP0404097 | WO9301161 | US5208020 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | WO9411026 | WO9429351 | US5416064 | US5500362 | EP0425235 | US5571894 | US5587458 | US5624821 | US5635483 | US5648260 | US5648237 | US5658570 | WO9730087 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5731168 | US5739116 | US5750373 | US5767285 | US5770429 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5789199 | US5821337 | US5840523 | WO9858964 | US5869046 | US5877296 | WO9922764 | US5959177 | WO9951642 | US6040498 | US6075181 | WO0061739 | US6150584 | US6171586 | US6194551 | WO0129246 | US6248516 | US6267958 | WO0231140 | US6417429 | US6420548 | US2002164328 | WO03011878 | US2003115614 | US6602684 | US2003157108 | US6630579 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2005014934 | US2005079574 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | WO2005047327 | US2005119455 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | WO2005100402 | US2005260186 | US2005266000 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006031370 | WO2006029879 | WO2006044908 | US7041870 | US2006104968 | US7087409 | US7125978 | US7189826 | US2007061900 | US2007117126 | US2007160598 | US2007237764 | US2007292936 | US7332581 | US2008069820 | US7371826 | WO2008077546 | US2009002360 | US7498298 | WO2009041643 | US7521541 | US7527791 | WO2009080251 | WO2009080252 | WO2009080253 | WO2009080254 | WO2009089004 | WO2010048313 | WO2010112193 | WO2010115589 | WO2010136172 | WO2010145792 | WO2010145793 | - WARD, E.S.; OBER, R.J., ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 103, pages 77 - 115 | - GHETIE, V. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 637 - 640 | - ISRAEL, E.J., IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 89, pages 573 - 578 | - JUNGHANS, R.P.; ANDERSON, C.L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5512 - 5516 | - AKILESH, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 967 - 972 | - DICKINSON, B.L. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, pages 903 - 911 | - KIM, H. ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2008), vol. 49, pages 2025 - 2029 | - SPIEKERMANN, G.M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2002), vol. 196, pages 303 - 310 | - ZHU, X. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, pages 3266 - 3276 | - ADAMSKI, F.M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 37, pages 435 - 444 | - AHOUSE, J.J. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 6076 - 6088 | - KACSKOVICS, I. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 1889 - 1897 | - KACSKOVICS, I. ET AL., DEV. COMP. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 30, pages 1203 - 1215 | - KANDIL, E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5907 - 5918 | - MAYER, B. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 107, pages 288 - 296 | - SCHNULLE, P.M.; HURLEY, W.L., VET. IMMUNOL. IMMUNOPATHOL., (2003), vol. 91, pages 227 - 231 | - SIMISTER, N.E.; MOSTOV, K.E., NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, pages 184 - 187 | - STORY, C.M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 180, pages 2377 - 2381 | - OBER, R.J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11076 - 11081 | - OBER, R.J. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 172, pages 2021 - 2029 | - PRABHAT, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, pages 5889 - 5894 | - DALL'ACQUA, W.F. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 23514 - 23524 | - HINTON, P.R. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 6213 - 6216 | - HINTON, P.R. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 176, pages 346 - 356 | - SHIELDS, R.L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - KABAT, E.A. ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, (1991), pages 91 - 3242 | - HUBER, A.H. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 230, pages 1077 - 1083 | - CHOTHIA, C.; LESK, A.M., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - ALMAGRO, J.C.; FRANSSON, J., FRONT. BIOSCI., (2008), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 1633 | - ELLMAN ET AL., METH. ENZYM., (1991), vol. 202, pages 301 - 336 | - NOREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, page 182 | - KINDT, T.J. ET AL., Kuby Immunology, W.H. FREEMAN AND CO., (2007), page 91 | - PORTOLANO, S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 880 - 887 | - CLACKSON, T. ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - WANG, W. ET AL., DRUG METAB. DISP., (2011), vol. 39, pages 1469 - 1477 | - DATTA-MANNAN, A. ET AL., DRUG METAB. DISP., (2012), vol. 40, pages 1545 - 1555 | - VAUGHN, D.E.; BJORKMAN, P.J., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 9374 - 9380 | - RAGHAVAN, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 11200 - 11204 | - MARTIN, W.L.; BJORKMAN, P.J., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 12639 - 12647 | - POLLASTRINI, J. ET AL., BIOCHEM., (2011), vol. 414, pages 88 - 98 | - GURBAXANI, B. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 43, pages 1462 - 1473 | - GURBAXANI, B.M.; MORRISON, S.L., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 43, pages 1379 - 1389 | - GURBAXANI, B., CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 122, pages 121 - 124 | - YEUNG, Y.A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 7663 - 7671 | - MARTIN, C.R. ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY-NEWS & FEATURES, (19980501), pages 322A - 327A | - DALL'ACQUA, W.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, vol. 169 | - MEDESAN, C. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 26, page 2533 | - FIRAN, M. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 13, page 993 | - KIM, J.K. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 542 | - KIM, J.K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, page 2819 | - FIRAN, M. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 13, page 993 | - YEUNG, Y.A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 7667 - 7671 | - SPIEKERMAN, G.M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2002), vol. 196, pages 303 - 310 | - PETKOVA, S.B. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, pages 1759 - 1769 | - ZALEVSKY, J. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 28, pages 157 - 159 | - HUDSON, P.J. ET AL., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 129 - 134 | - PLUECKTHUN, A., The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - MORRISON, S.L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - RIECHMANN, I. ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - QUEEN, C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - KASHMIRI, S.V. ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, pages 25 - 34 | - PADLAN, E.A., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498 | - DALL'ACQUA, W.F. ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, pages 43 - 60 | - OSBOURN, J. ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, pages 61 - 68 | - KLIMKA, A. ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (2000), vol. 83, pages 252 - 260 | - SIMS, M.J. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 2296 - 2308 | - CARTER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 4285 - 4289 | - PRESTA, L.G. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 2623 - 2632 | - BACA, M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 10678 - 10684 | - ROSOK, M.J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 22611 - 22618 | - VAN DIJK, M.A.; VAN DE WINKEL, J.G., CURR. OPIN. PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 5, pages 368 - 374 | - LONBERG, N., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 20, pages 450 - 459 | - LONBERG, N., NAT. BIOTECH., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1117 - 1125 | - KOZBOR, D., J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, pages 3001 - 3005 | - BRODEUR, B.R. ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63 | - BOERNER, P. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95 | - LI, J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 3557 - 3562 | - NI, J., XIANDAI MIANYIXUE, (2006), vol. 26, pages 265 - 268 | - VOLLMERS, H.P.; BRANDLEIN, S., HISTOLOGY AND HISTOPATHOLOGY, (2005), vol. 20, pages 927 - 937 | - VOLLMERS, H.P.; BRANDLEIN, S., METHODS AND FINDINGS IN EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2005), vol. 27, pages 185 - 191 | - HOOGENBOOM, H.R. ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 178, pages 1 - 37 | - MCCAFFERTY, J. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - MARKS, J.D. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MARKS, J.D.; BRADBURY, A., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 248, pages 161 - 175 | - SIDHU, S.S. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 338, pages 299 - 310 | - LEE, C.V. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 340, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, F.A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE, C.V. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 284, pages 119 - 132 | - WINTER, G. ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - GRIFFITHS, A.D. ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HOOGENBOOM, H.R.; WINTER, G., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 381 - 388 | - MILSTEIN, C.; CUELLO, A.C., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 540 | - TRAUNECKER, A. ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83 | - KOSTELNY, S.A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 5368 - 5374 | - TUTT, A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - CHOWDHURY, P.S., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 207, pages 179 - 196 | - HOOGENBOOM, H.R.; 2002 ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 178, pages 1 - 37 | - CUNNINGHAM, B.C.; WELLS, J.A., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - WRIGHT, A. A; MORRISON, S.L., TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32 | - OKAZAKI, A. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 336, pages 1239 - 1249 | - YAMANE-OHNUKI, N. ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG., (2004), vol. 87, pages 614 - 622 | - RIPKA, J. ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1986), vol. 249, pages 533 - 545 | - KANDA, Y. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 94, pages 680 - 688 | - RAVETCH, J.V.; KINET, J.P., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492 | - HELLSTROM, I. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 7059 - 7063 | - HELLSTROM, I. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 1499 - 1502 | - BRUGGEMANN, M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, pages 1351 - 1361 | - CLYNES, R. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO, H. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 202, pages 163 - 171 | - CRAGG, M.S. ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1045 - 1052 | - CRAGG, M.S.; M.J. GLENNIE, BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 2738 - 2743 | - IDUSOGIE, E.E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 4178 - 4184 | - GUYER, R.L. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, pages 587 - 593 | - KIM, J.K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 2429 - 2434 | - DUNCAN, A.R.; WINTER, G., NATURE, (1988), vol. 322, pages 738 - 740 | - KAM, N.W. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 11600 - 11605 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - OI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 6351 - 6355 | - CHARLTON, K.A., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 245 - 254 | - GERNGROSS, T.U., NAT. BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - LI, H. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - GRAHAM, F.L. ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, pages 59 - 74 | - MATHER, J.P., BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 252 | - MATHER, J.P ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB, G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - YAZAKI, P.; WU, A.M., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2004), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - HINMAN, L.M. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - LODE, H.N. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, pages 2925 - 2928 | - KRATZ, F. ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 13, pages 477 - 523 | - JEFFREY, S.C. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2006), vol. 16, pages 358 - 362 | - TORGOV, M.Y. ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 16, pages 717 - 721 | - NAGY, A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 829 - 834 | - DUBOWCHIK, G.M. ET AL., BIOORG. & MED. CHEM. LETTERS, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1529 - 1532 | - KING, H.D. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 4336 - 4343 | - VITETTA, E.S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, pages 1098 - 1104 | - CHARI, R.V. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131 |