EP2814827 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING TIOTROPIUM BROMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hovione International Ltd. Aubin House 11th Floor 171-172 Gloucester Wanchai / HK | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBRAL, Luis Av. Diogo Cão N°24 7° Urbanização Quinta do Infantado 2670-327 Loures / PT | 02 /
TEMTEM Marcio Rua Manuel de Arriaga Lote 1441 2°D 2975-329 Quinta do Conde / PT | 03 /
ANTUNES, Rafael Rua Eng ° Henrique Cabeçadas N°31 3°D 2900-005 Setúbal / PT | 04 /
NUNES, Bruna Av. da Mague Iote 25, 6°D Urbanizaçao Malvarosa Parque 2615-043 Alverca do Ribatejo / PT | [2016/25] |
Former [2014/52] | 01 /
SOBRAL, Luis Av. Diogo Cão N°24 7° Urbanização Quinta do Infantado 2670-327 Loures / PT | ||
02 /
TEMTEM Marcio Rua Manuel de Arriaga Lote 1441 2°D 2975-329 Quinta do Conde / PT | |||
03 /
ANTUNES, Rafael Rua Eng ° Henrique Cabeçadas N°31 3°D 2900-005 Setúbal / PT | |||
04 /
NUNES, Bruna Av. da Mague lite 25 6° Urbanizaçao Malvarosa Parque 2615-045 Alverca / PT | Representative(s) | King, Lawrence A.A. Thornton & Co. Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | King, Lawrence A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13704817.9 | 08.02.2013 | [2016/25] | WO2013GB00050 | Priority number, date | PT20120106142 | 10.02.2012 Original published format: PT 10614212 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117886 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814827 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814827 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/10, C07D451/14 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C07D451/14 (EP,US);
C07D451/10 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61P11/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | C07D451/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIOTROPIUM-BROMID | [2015/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING TIOTROPIUM BROMIDE | [2014/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BROMURE DE TIOTROPIUM | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIOTROPIUMBROMID | ||
Former [2014/52] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE BROMURE DE TIOTROPIUM | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 14.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | GR | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | LU | 08.02.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2007075858 (SICOR INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-31 * examples 1-6; claim - *; | [Y]US2008051582 (BUSOLLI JONATHAN [IT], et al) [Y] 1-31 * example -; claim - *; | CN101863885 [ ] (NANJING JINDANCHENG MEDICINETECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [AD]WO2011015884 (GENERICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-31* example -; claim - *; | [I] - HOU, BENJING ET AL, "Method for preparing tiotropium bromide", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2010:1325904, URL: STN, XP002694000 [I] 1-31 * abstract * | by applicant | US648632 | EP0418716 | EP1410144 | US6747154 | US6777423 | EP1682544 | WO2007022531 | EP1869035 | EP1879888 | WO2009087419 | EP2085396 | US7662963 | US2010215590 | WO2011015882 | WO2011015884 |