EP2806795 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ASSESSING MUSCLE ELECTRICAL ACTIVITY IN RESPONSE TO STIMULATION OF A MOTOR NERVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACACIA DESIGNS BV Kesselskade 59C 6211 EN Maastricht / NL | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states T4 Analytics LLC Suite 101 160 Greentree Drive Dover, Delaware 19904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPTON, David Robert 18130 NE 154th Street Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | 02 /
LARIK, Vincent C.M.H. Kaalheidersteenweg 209 NL-6466AE Kerkrade / NL | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 13705050.6 | 25.01.2013 | WO2013US23171 | Priority number, date | US201261591549P | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591549 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112854 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806795 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
A61B5/1106 (EP,US);
A61B5/395 (US);
A61B5/4052 (EP,US);
A61B5/4848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER ELEKTRISCHEN MUSKELAKTIVITÄT IN REAKTION AUF DIE STIMULATION EINES MOTORISCHEN NERVS | [2014/49] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ASSESSING MUSCLE ELECTRICAL ACTIVITY IN RESPONSE TO STIMULATION OF A MOTOR NERVE | [2014/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES PERMETTANT D'ÉVALUER L'ACTIVITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE MUSCULAIRE EN RÉPONSE À LA STIMULATION D'UN NERF MOTEUR | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5131401 (WESTENSKOW DWAYNE R [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 63 * * column 3, line 18 - line 53 * * column 5, line 23 - column 7, line 50 *; | [A]US6146335 (GOZANI SHAI N [US]) [A] 1-52 * column 1, line 16 - line 39 * * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 29 * * column 8, line 6 - column 10, line 63 * * column 18, line 6 - column 25, line 8 *; | [A]WO0193748 (NUVASIVE INC [US]) [A] 1-52 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 34 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2006042075 (NUVASIVE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * page 1, line 18 - page 4, line 13 * * page 13, line 21 - page 13, line 25 * * page 14, line 19 - page 20, line 12 *; | [XI]US2007270918 (DE BEL MAXIME [BE], et al) [X] 1-25,32,39-52 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0233] - paragraph [0256] * [I] 26-31,33-38; | [A]US2010286554 (DAVIS TIMOTHY TAYLOR [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0102] ** figures 13-16 * |