EP2817103 - MULTILAYER COATING WITH A FILLER LAYER MADE OF A NON-AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL CONTAINING AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT POLYESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONNEMANN, Heinrich Paul-Gerhardt-Weg 1 48291 Telgte / DE | 02 /
OBERHOFF, Markus Beckkamp 1 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 03 /
RIEPING, Martin Fanny-Mendelssohnstrasse 5 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 04 /
PODLASKI-PYZIK, Beate Ringstrasse 147 48165 Münster / DE | 05 /
MORCILLO RUIZ, Carole 53 avenue de la Libération Résidence du Château F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | 06 /
HARTUNG, Michael Zu den 3 Linden 1a 59590 Geseke / DE | [2015/02] |
Former [2015/01] | 01 /
WONNEMANN, Heinrich Paul-Gerhardt-Weg 1 48291 Telgte / DE | ||
02 /
OBERHOFF, Markus Mühlenstrasse 8 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | |||
03 /
RIEPING, Martin Fanny-Mendelssohnstrasse 5 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | |||
04 /
PODLASKI-PYZIK, Beate Ringstrasse 147 48165 Münster / DE | |||
05 /
MORCILLO RUIZ, Carole 53 avenue de la Libération Résidence du Château F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | |||
06 /
HARTUNG, Michael Zu den 3 Linden 1a 59590 Geseke / DE | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13705181.9 | 20.02.2013 | [2016/16] | WO2013EP53386 | Priority number, date | US201261601054P | 21.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261601054 P | EP20120156356 | 21.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12156356 | [2015/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124322 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817103 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817103 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/00, C08J7/04, C09D167/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
B05D7/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09D167/02 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D7/53 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/57 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/576 (US);
C08K3/04 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR,US);
C09D167/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05D2202/00 (KR,US);
B05D2401/10 (EP,KR,US);
B05D2504/00 (US);
B05D2508/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05D2601/00 (US);
B05D2601/02 (US);
B05D2601/04 (US);
B05D2601/20 (US);
B05D2601/22 (US);
B05D2601/24 (US);
B05D3/02 (US);
B05D7/24 (US);
B05D7/56 (US);
B05D7/574 (US);
B05D7/577 (US);
B32B15/04 (US);
B32B15/08 (US);
B32B15/09 (US);
B32B15/092 (US);
B32B15/098 (US);
B32B2255/06 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2255/28 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
C08K2003/2224 (US);
C08K2003/2227 (US);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
C08K2003/262 (US);
C08K2003/265 (US);
C08K2003/267 (US);
C08K2003/3045 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C08K3/34 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/29 (US);
C08L61/00 (US);
C08L61/26 (US);
C08L61/28 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C08L67/00 (US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C08L67/03 (US);
C09D161/00 (US);
C09D161/26 (US);
C09D161/28 (US);
C09D163/00 (US);
C09D167/03 (US);
C09D5/00 (US);
C09D5/002 (US);
C09D5/08 (US);
C09D7/20 (US);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/65 (US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/00, C08L67/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHT-BESCHICHTUNG MIT EINER FÜLLERSCHICHT AUS EINEM NICHT-WÄSSRIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFF ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS ZWEI VERSCHIEDENE POLYESTER | [2015/01] | English: | MULTILAYER COATING WITH A FILLER LAYER MADE OF A NON-AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL CONTAINING AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT POLYESTERS | [2015/01] | French: | REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE REMPLISSAGE CONSTITUÉE D'UN MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT NON AQUEUX CONTENANT AU MOINS DEUX POLYESTERS DIFFÉRENTS | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2013 | AL | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | MT | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | IS | 20.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.04.2016 | |
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0250052 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9847974 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 14, lines 1-31 * * page 16, line 22 - page 17, line 11 *; | [A]WO2009086034 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,10,11 * * page 7, lines 28,29 * * page 10, lines 16-24 * * page 11, lines 27,28 * * page 14, lines 11-21 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 14 * * page 19, lines 15-18 *; | [A]DE102008016050 (VOEST ALPINE STAHL [AT]) [A] 1-15 * tables 3,5 * |