EP2956405 - HYDROGEN GENERATOR WITH FUEL GAUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy, Inc. 1731 Technology Drive, No.755 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIMITS, Jason, L. 38202 Heron Lane Avon, OH 44011 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13705368.2 | 12.02.2013 | [2015/52] | WO2013US25657 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014126546 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956405 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/02, C01B3/04, G01F23/22 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C01B3/02 (EP);
C01B3/04 (EP);
G01F23/22 (EP);
G01F23/223 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFGENERATOR MIT KRAFTSTOFFMESSER | [2015/52] | English: | HYDROGEN GENERATOR WITH FUEL GAUGE | [2015/52] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'HYDROGÈNE DOTÉ D'UNE JAUGE DE CARBURANT | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 05.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 10.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]US7642742 (CURELLO ANDREW J [US], et al) [ID] 1-19 * column 2, line 34 - line 37 * * column 6, line 5 - line 35 * * column 9, line 36 - line 39 * * page 9, line 55 - line 58; figure - *; | [ID]US7117732 (CURELLO ANDREW J [US], et al) [ID] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [ID]US7674541 (IHARA SHOJI [JP], et al) [ID] 1-19 * column 9, line 65 - column 12, line 13 *; | [I]US2009309603 (HARADA SHUUJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 36] , [0 46] *; | [A] - R.K. AHLUWALIA, T.Q. HUA, J.K. PENG, "Automotive storage of hydrogen in alane", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, vol. 34, no. 18, ISSN 0360-3199, (200909), pages 7731 - 7740, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2009.07.013, (20131024), XP002715439 [A] 1-19 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2009.07.013 | by applicant | US6155099 | US7117732 | US7698936 | US7642742 | US7254983 | US7674541 | US8268028 | US2011027168 | US7867441 | US6749702 | US7964111 | US2008236032 | US2008241613 | - VARMA ET AL., CHEM. ENG. SCI., (2010), vol. 65, pages 80 - 87 | - INT. J. HYDROGEN EN, (2007), vol. 32, pages 207 - 211 | WO2013US21538 |