EP2817032 - CROSSLINKED POLYSACCHARIDE BEADS COMPRISING AN IMAGING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Diderot - Paris 7 5, rue Thomas Mann 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Univ Paris XIII Paris-Nord Villetaneuse 99 av Jean-Baptiste Clément 93430 Villetaneuse / FR | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERKAOUI, Sidi Mohammed INSERM U698 CHU Xavier Bichat 46 rue Henri Huchard F-75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
LE VISAGE, Catherine INSERM U698 CHU Xavier Bichat 46 rue Henri Huchard F-75018 Paris / FR | 03 /
BONNARD, Thomas INSERM U698 CHU Xavier Bichat 46 rue Henri Huchard F-78018 Paris / FR | 04 /
LE TOURNEUR, Didier INSERM U698 CHU Xavier Bichat 46 rue Henri Huchard F-75018 Paris / FR | 05 /
SERFATY, Jean-Michel INSERM UMR 1087/CNRS UMR 6291 IRS-Université de Nantes 8 quai Moncousu F-44007 Nantes cedex 1 / FR | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13705502.6 | 22.02.2013 | WO2013EP53608 | Priority number, date | EP20120305224 | 24.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12305224 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124444 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817032 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/12, A61K49/22, A61K49/18, A61K49/04, A61K49/00, A61K103/10, A61K9/16 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K49/0091 (EP,US);
A61K49/048 (EP,US);
A61K49/1824 (US);
A61K49/1887 (EP,US);
A61K49/225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Title | German: | VERNETZTE POLYSACCHARIDSTÄMME MIT EINEM ABBILDUNGSMITTEL | [2015/01] | English: | CROSSLINKED POLYSACCHARIDE BEADS COMPRISING AN IMAGING AGENT | [2015/01] | French: | BILLES DE POLYSSACCHARIDE RÉTICULÉ COMPRENANT UN AGENT D'IMAGERIE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010116209 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 12 * * page 23, line 20 - page 25, line 30 * * example - * * claim - *; | [XPL]WO2012028623 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [XP] 1,3,7-17 * page 9, line 25 * * page 10, lines 6-23 * * page 13, lines 7-8 * * page 16, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 18, paragraph last * * claim - * [L] 1,3,7-17 | [X] - BANERJEE T ET AL, "preparation, characterisation and biodistribution of ultrafine chitosan nanoparticles", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20020101), vol. 243, doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(02)00267-3, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 93 - 105, XP002389212 [X] 11-17 * page 95, section 2.2 * * page 96, section 2.4. * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(02)00267-3 | [XI] - SUDAKAR C ET AL, "Fe3O4 incorporated AOT-alginate nanoparticles for drug delivery", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS IEEE USA, (200811), vol. 44, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 2800 - 2803, XP002677501 [X] 11-17 * page 2800, column right, paragraph last - page 2801, column left, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [I] 1,3,7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2008.2001324 | [XI] - TOKUMITSU H ET AL, "Design and preparation of gadolinium-loaded chitosan particles for cancer neutron capture therapy", S.T.P. PHARMA SCIENCES 200001 FR, (200001), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 1157-1489, pages 39 - 49, XP000951450 [X] 11,12,14-17 * pages 40-41, section "Preparation" * [I] 1,3,7-10 | [A] - SEZER A D ET AL, "Fucosphere - New microsphere carriers for peptide and protein delivery: Preparation and in vitro characterization", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, (200608), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 513 - 522, XP002677502 [A] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02652040600687563 | by applicant | US5413760 | US5603895 | - B. LI ET AL., MOLECULES, (2008), vol. 13, pages 1671 - 1695 | - D. LOGEART ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER RES., (1996), vol. 30, pages 501 - 508 | - T. NISHINO ET AL., CARBOHYDR. RES., (1992), vol. 229, pages 355 - 362 | - S. SOEDA ET AL., THROMB. RES., (1993), vol. 72, pages 247 - 256 | - T.V. POCHECHUEVA ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 13, pages 1709 - 1712 | - F.S. VALLANUEVA ET AL., NAT. CLIN. PRACT. CARDIOVASC. MED., (2008), vol. 5, no. 2, pages S26 - S32 | - J. RAO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 18, pages 17 - 25 |