EP2828517 - OVERMOLDED COMPONENT WITH A LABYRINTH SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROMER, Ralf Einsteinstr. 4 71665 Vaihingen An Der Enz / DE | [2015/05] | Application number, filing date | 13706215.4 | 18.02.2013 | WO2013EP53210 | Priority number, date | DE201210204302 | 19.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012204302 | [2015/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139546 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828517 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/16 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
F02M63/007 (US);
B29C63/0056 (US);
B29D99/0053 (US);
F02M61/166 (US);
B29C2063/006 (US);
B29K2101/00 (US);
B29L2031/748 (US);
F02M2200/8046 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | UMSPRITZTES BAUELEMENT MIT EINEM DICHTLABYRINTH | [2015/05] | English: | OVERMOLDED COMPONENT WITH A LABYRINTH SEAL | [2015/05] | French: | ÉLÉMENT STRUCTURAL ENROBÉ PAR EXTRUSION DOTÉ D'UN LABYRINTHE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10310789 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,8,11* figures 1-3c *; | [Y]DE102005037953 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,6,7 * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE102006020689 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,11 * figures 1,2.1,2.4 * [Y] 2,6,7 | Examination | DE19936426 | US2009017242 | EP2589789 |