EP2817831 - A FRAMING STRUCTURE FOR A SOLAR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, LLC. 4500 McGinnis Ferry Road Alpharetta, GA 30005-3914 / US | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEUNIER, Vincent, Pierre 22 Avenue Prince d'Orange B-1410 Waterloo / BE | 02 /
HRIVNAK, Jeffrey A. 74 Mt. Aire Farl Road Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | 03 /
DESIO, Glenn P. 2853 Interlaken Dr. Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | 04 /
BRASSEUR, Philippe Avenue Bel Horizon, 11 1332 Genval / BE | [2015/09] |
Former [2015/01] | 01 /
MEUNIER, Vincent, Pierre 22 Avenue Prince d'Orange B-1410 Waterloo / BE | ||
02 /
HRIVNAK, Jeffrey A. 74 Mt. Aire Farl Road Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | |||
03 /
DESIO, Glenn P. 2853 Interlaken Dr. Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | |||
04 /
BRASSEUR, Philippe Rue de Haerne 59A B-1040 Brussels / BE | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2015/01] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al SOLVAY SA Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 13706499.4 | 22.02.2013 | [2020/52] | WO2013EP53601 | Priority number, date | US201261602924P | 24.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261602924 P | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013124440 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2817831 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817831 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, H01L31/048, F24S25/20 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
F24S25/11 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
F24S25/20 (EP,US);
H01L31/05 (US);
H02S30/10 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29L2012/00 (US);
F24S2080/015 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49863 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H01L31/042, F24J2/52, H01L31/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAHMENSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN SOLARPANEEL | [2015/01] | English: | A FRAMING STRUCTURE FOR A SOLAR PANEL | [2015/01] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ENCADREMENT POUR PANNEAU SOLAIRE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2013 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | ES | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | IE | 22.02.2021 | LU | 22.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009086238 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 2; figure - *; | [Y]WO2006020402 (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005068303 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,12-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011109629 (FULLER H B CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]EP1074585 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9916829 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | US4892927 | WO9212194 | EP1186634 | EP1842879 | EP1552965 | by applicant | US4123570 | US2011030767 | US5346984 | US5959069 | WO9635739 | EP0672703 | WO2007113262 | WO2009050268 | WO2011039183 | - Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemical Analysis, (1973), vol. 17, page 293 | - JOHN MURPHY, Additives for Plastics Handbook, 2nd edition,, pages 43 - 48 |