EP2836581 - A HIGHLY EFFICIENT AND CONVENIENT FORM OF MICROFIBROUS CELLULOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CP Kelco U.S., Inc. 3100 Cumberland Boulevard, Suite 600 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWAZEY, John 13183 Sunstone Pointe San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
MORRISON, Neil 12332 Briardale Way San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 03 /
YANG, Zhi-Fa 9309 Pipilo Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 04 /
COMPTON, Jacqueline 800 The Mark Lane San Diego, CA 92101 / US | 05 /
NOLAN, Tim 1413 Silver Springs Drive Chula Vista, CA 91915 / US | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2015/08] | Kiernan, Lisa, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13706882.1 | 15.02.2013 | [2021/14] | WO2013US26355 | Priority number, date | US201261624086P | 13.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261624086 P | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154675 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836581 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836581 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22, A61K8/73 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTE UND ZWECKMÄSSIGE FORM VON MIKROFASERCELLULOSE | [2015/08] | English: | A HIGHLY EFFICIENT AND CONVENIENT FORM OF MICROFIBROUS CELLULOSE | [2015/08] | French: | FORME DE CELLULOSE MICROFIBREUSE TRÈS EFFICACE ET COMMODE | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 19.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2022
11.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Rhodia Operations 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2022
11.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Rhodia Operations 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2022
11.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Rhodia Operations 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2022
11.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Rhodia Operations 52 rue la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervillers / FR Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | 19.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 29.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0474/24 | 29.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.06.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | LU | 15.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2008108714 (SWAZEY JOHN M [US], et al) [AD] 1-12* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006]; example -; claim - *; | [XI]US2010016575 (YANG ZHI-FA [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0032]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-12 | by applicant | US5951910 | US6241812 | US2007027108 | US2008108541 | US2008108714 | US7888308 | US8053216 | Opposition | US5009797 | JPH05292984 | WO9806792 | WO9841592 | US5951910 | US2007197779 | JP2009296979 | US2010210501 | WO2011019876 | CN102206689 | - Anonymous, "Komagataeibacter xylinus", Wikipedia, (20210929), pages 1 - 3, XP055898595 | - Anonymous, "Ultra-High Shear Preparation of CELLULON PX and AxCel CG-PX Microfibrous Cellulose Blend Solutions", application bulletin - CP KELCO, (20090000), pages 1 - 6, XP055898601 | - Anonymous, "SECTION 1: Identification of the substance /mixture and of the company/undertaking", AXCEL CG-PX Safety Data Sheet, (20111207), pages 1 - 9, XP055898603 |