EP2820438 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING CURRENTS OR MAGNETIC FIELDS USING HALL SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACKNER, Michael Stachasweg 16 93155 Hernau, OT Haag / DE | 02 /
HOHE, Hans-Peter Burggrub 28 91332 Heiligenstadt / DE | 03 /
SAND, Markus St.-Jodok-Str. 6 92723 Tännesberg / DE | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Gagel, Roland Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13707276.5 | 26.02.2013 | [2016/21] | WO2013EP00564 | Priority number, date | DE20121003978 | 28.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012003978 | [2015/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127522 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820438 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820438 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/00, G01R33/07, G01R15/20 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G01R15/202 (EP,US);
G01D5/142 (US);
G01R33/0017 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (US);
G01R33/075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG VON STRÖMEN ODER MAGNETFELDERN MIT HALL-SENSOREN | [2015/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING CURRENTS OR MAGNETIC FIELDS USING HALL SENSORS | [2015/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE COURANTS OU DE CHAMPS MAGNÉTIQUES AU MOYEN DE CAPTEURS À EFFET HALL | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 07.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2013 | AL | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | MT | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | IS | 25.09.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | IE | 26.02.2017 | LU | 26.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009009164 (UTSUNO KIKUO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0050] *; | [A]DE102009017881 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040] *; | [AD] - ALEXANDRE KERLAIN ET AL, "Hybrid Hall microsystem for high dynamic range/large bandwidth magnetometry applications", 2008 IEEE SENSORS,LECCE, ITALY, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081026), ISBN 978-1-4244-2580-8, pages 1044 - 1047, XP031375260 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006059421 | - A. KERLAIN ET AL., "Hybrid Hall microsystem for high dynamic range/large bandwidth magnetometry applications", IEEE SENSORS, (2008), pages 1044 - 1047, XP031375260 |