EP2820721 - DEVICE FOR CLOSING A PLUG CONNECTOR HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRESEN, Jens Schambrede 28 32825 Blomberg / DE | 02 /
GERULLIS, Jens Braker Mitte 25 32657 Lemgo / DE | 03 /
DIEßEL, Thorsten Weizenstraße 26 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Janke, Christiane Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13707809.3 | 01.02.2013 | [2018/16] | WO2013EP00314 | Priority number, date | DE201210101614 | 28.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012101614 | [2015/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127487 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820721 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820721 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H01R13/62933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHLIEßEN EINES GEHÄUSES EINES STECKVERBINDERS | [2015/02] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLOSING A PLUG CONNECTOR HOUSING | [2015/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE D'UN BOÎTIER D'UN CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 16.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2013 | AL | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | MT | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE102004011509 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 3[I] 4,5; | [XI]DE202005005241U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1b,4,5,6,7,8 * [I] 3-5; | [XI]EP2110894 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5; claims 1,6 * [I] 3-5 | by applicant | DE3937022 |