EP2825592 - Medical injection molded article comprising a propylene polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/04] | PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pontaccio 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2018/13] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pontaccio 10 20127 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESTRO, Mara Via Azzoguidi 2 I-44138 Bologna / IT | 02 /
CIARAFONI, Marco Via Risorgimento 84 I-44123 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
MASSARI, Paola Via E. Farolfi 3 I-44121 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
SQUARZONI, Stefano Via Roma 64 I-40015 Galliera (BO) / IT | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 13708821.7 | 12.03.2013 | [2018/47] | WO2013EP54934 | Priority number, date | EP20120159132 | 13.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12159132 | US201261610305P | 13.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261610305 P | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013135654 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825592 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825592 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/14, B29C45/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,CN,US);
C08L23/16 (US);
C08L2201/10 (EP,CN,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6465 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F4/651 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6545 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L23/14 (US,EP);
C08L23/142, C08L23/16 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinischer Spritzgussartikel enthaltend eine Propylenpolymerzusammensetzung | [2017/41] | English: | Medical injection molded article comprising a propylene polymer composition | [2017/41] | French: | Article médical preparé par injection-moulage comprenant une composition de polymère en propylène | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/04] | PROPYLENPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2015/04] | PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2015/04] | COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES DE PROPYLÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 01.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2013 | AL | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | GB | 12.03.2019 | IE | 12.03.2019 | LU | 12.03.2019 | MT | 12.03.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.03.2013 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03046021 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 1-4,8 * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]EP2022824 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I]EP2264099 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT]) [I] 1-6 * claims 1-7 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0014] , [0025] * * example 1; tables 1,3 * | by applicant | EP0045977 | US4399054 | US4472524 | US4634740 | EP0361493 | EP0557953 | EP0728769 | EP1012195 | WO0192406 |