EP2825417 - DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR AN EXTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Auteca GmbH Ellin-Süd-Strasse 14 8160 Krottendorf bei Weiz / AT | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Magna Auteca AG Elin-Süd-Strasse 14 8160 Weiz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALVOELGYI, Martin Reith 55 A-8311 Markt Hartmannsdorf / AT | 02 /
SCHADLER, Bernhard Oberrettenbach 85 A-8211 Oberrettenbach / AT | 03 /
FUCHS, Reinhard Hart 99 A-8212 Pischelsdorf / AT | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Völger, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13709196.3 | 13.03.2013 | WO2013EP55103 | Priority number, date | EP20120075025 | 14.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12075025 | [2015/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013135756 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825417 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/074 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B60R1/074 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN AUßENRÜCKSPIEGEL EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2015/04] | English: | DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR AN EXTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR OF A VEHICLE | [2015/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN RÉTROVISEUR EXTÉRIEUR D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 19.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2230131 (SMR PATENTS SARL [LU]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063]; figures 6, 13 *; | [A]US2009229962 (BROUWER STEFAN FRITS [NL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | WO2012047104 | by applicant | EP0931699 |