EP2827885 - COMPOSITIONS OF GLP-1 PEPTIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILHELMSEN, Thomas Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
ELIASEN, Helle Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
HANSEN, Tue Novo Nordisk Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13709231.8 | 15.03.2013 | [2018/33] | WO2013EP55362 | Priority number, date | EP20120160743 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12160743 | US201361748840P | 04.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748840 P | EP20130153459 | 31.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13153459 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139694 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827885 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2827885 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61P3/10, A61K47/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/2013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/20, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON GLP-1-PEPTIDEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2018/09] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF GLP-1 PEPTIDES AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2015/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PEPTIDES GLP-1 ET LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2015/05] |
Former [2015/05] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON GLP-1-PEPTIDEN UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18188815.7 / EP3488857 | EP23177173.4 / EP4324475 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative von Kauffmann, Carl Global IP Group - Teva Graf-Arco-Straße 3 89079 Ulm / DE | 02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. CL Sant Gabriel n°50 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L.U. CL Sant Gabriel nº50 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. CL Sant Gabriel n°50 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L.U. CL Sant Gabriel nº50 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2022/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avenida Diagonal 123, 11th floor 08005 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avinguda de Cornellà 144, 7th floor 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd P.O. Box 3190 5 Basel Street 4951033 Petah-Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avenida Diagonal 123, 11th floor 08005 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avinguda de Cornellà 144, 7th floor 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2020/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd P.O. Box 3190 5 Basel Street 4951033 Petah-Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avenida Diagonal 123, 11th floor 08005 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L. Avenida de Cornellà 144, 7th floor 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd P.O. Box 3190 5 Basel Street 4951033 Petah-Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avenida Diagonal 123, 11th floor 08005 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L. Avenida de Cornellà 144, 7th floor 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
21.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2019
16.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd P.O. Box 3190 5 Basel Street 4951033 Petah-Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
15.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Galenicum Health S.L.U. Avenida Diagonal 123, 11th floor 08005 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Torrejón-Nieto, Javier Galenicum Health S.L. Avenida de Cornellà 144, 7th floor 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
03
15.05.2019
Hexal AG Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
04
15.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL 10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 03.06.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2020 | 29.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0291/22 | 03.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009124639 (OYEWUMI MOSES [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * example 8 *; | [AP]WO2012080471 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [AP] 1-15* the whole document * | Opposition | WO2005107462 | WO2006084164 | WO2006124047 | WO2008003050 | WO2012080471 | WO2007146234 | US2009124639 | WO2010020978 | WO2011094531 | EP2827885 | WO2006097537 | WO2008028859 | - STEINERT et al., "Oral administration of glucagon-like peptide 1 or peptide YY 3-36 affects food intake in healthy male subjects", Am J Clin Nutr, (20100000), vol. 92, pages 810 - 817, XP002677085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3945/ajcn.2010.29663 | - STEINERT et al., "Orally Administered Glucagon-Like Peptide-I Affects Glucose Homeostasis Following an Oral Glucose Tolerance Test in Healthy Male Subjects", Clinical Pharmacology & Therapy, (20090000), vol. 86, pages 644 - 650, XP002635568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/clpt.2009.159 | - VALENTINO et al., "Current trends in targeting the hormonal regulation of appetite and energy balance to treat obesity", Expert Rev Clin Pharmacol, (20100000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 73 - 88, XP055520546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/eem.10.33 | - BEGLINGER et al., "Pharmacokinetics and Pharmacodynamic Effects of Oral GLP-1 and PYY3-36: A Proof- of-Concept Study in Healthy Subjects", Clin. Pharmacol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 468 - 474, XP008149454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/clpt.2008.35 | - R. F. WITKAMP, "Current and Future Drug Targets in Weight Management", Pharm Res, (20110000), vol. 28, pages 1792 - 1818, XP019921746 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-010-0341-1 | - BHANSALI et al., "Historical Overview of Incretin Based Therapies", JAPI, (20100600), vol. 58, pages 1 - 14, XP055592040 | - BHANSALI et al., "Historical overview of incretin-based therapies", JAPI, (20100600), vol. 58, pages 10 - 14, XP055592040 | - BEGLINGER et al., "Pharmacokinetics and Pharmacodynamic Effects of Oral GLP-t and PYY3-36: A Proof-of-concept Study in Healthy Subjects", Clinical Pharmacology and therapeutics, (20081000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 468 - 474, XP008149454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/clpt.2008.35 | - "Granulation", Salman et al., The Handbook of Powder Technology, (20060000), vol. 11, page 1190, XP055592656 | - DILIP M. PARIKH, "Theory of Granulation : An Engineering Perspective", Handbook of Pharmaceutical Granulation Technology third edition, (20050000), page 7, XP055592665 | - ANTONY J HICKEY et al., "Mixing", Pharmaceutical Process Engineering SECOND EDITION, (20100000), page 159, XP055592679 | - STEINERT et al., "Oral administration of glucagon-like peptide 1 or peptide YY 3-36 affects food intake in healthy male subjects", Clinical Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (20090000), vol. 86, no. 6, pages 644 - 650, XP055592565 | - BEGLINGER et al., "Pharmacokinetics and pharmacodynamics Effects of Oral GLP-1 and PYY3-36: A Proof-of-concept Study in Healthy Subjects", Clinical Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (20080000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 468 - 474, XP008149454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/clpt.2008.35 | - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT01037582, A two part trial investigating the safety of NN9924 in healthy male subjects", Clinicaltrials.Gov, (20091200), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT01 037582, XP055592569 | - GRANHALL, C. et al., "Safety and Pharmacokinetics of Single and Multiple Ascending Doses of the Novel Oral Human GLP-1 Analogue, Oral Semaglutide, in Healthy Subjects and Subjects with Type 2 Diabetes", Clinical Pharmacokinetics, (20181200), pages 1 - 11, XP055545538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s40262-018-0728-4 | - Close K., "Diabetes Close Up, Baby Steps", Close Concerns, (20110300), no. 106, pages 1 - 50, XP0055592583 | - AUNGST, B.J., "Absorption enhancers: applications and advances", The AAPS Journal, (20110000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 10 - 18, XP035016737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/s12248-011-9307-4 | - "Chapter 1, Introduction", Handbook of Pharmaceutical Granulation Technology, SECOND EDITION, Taylor & Francis Group, LLC, (20050000), pages 1 - 6, XP055592603 |