EP2841801 - MULTI-SPEED GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 80846 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Stefan Brucknerstraße 3 88097 Eriskirch / DE | 02 /
SIBLA, Christian Oberhofstraße 54 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 03 /
RIEGER, Wolfgang Landvogteistraße 12/1 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13709418.1 | 13.03.2013 | WO2013EP55057 | Priority number, date | DE201210207085 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012207085 | [2015/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013159988 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841801 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/66 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
F16H3/66 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2200/0065 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2200/0069 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0082 (US);
F16H2200/0086 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2012 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2041 (CN,US);
F16H2200/2046 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2094 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFENGETRIEBE | [2015/10] | English: | MULTI-SPEED GEARBOX | [2015/10] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES MULTI-ÉTAGÉE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 05.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006349153 (KAWANA HIROKI) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102008038210 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE102008000428 |