EP2815449 - HYDROGEN GAS GENERATOR WITH FLEXIBLE FEED MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy, Inc. 1731 Technology Drive, No.755 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2015/20] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTON, Russell H. 332 Keary Street New Westminster, British Columbia V3L 3L3 / CA | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/52] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13709599.8 | 11.02.2013 | [2016/38] | WO2013US25487 | Priority number, date | US201261599468P | 16.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261599468 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122846 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815449 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2815449 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06, C01B3/02, B01J7/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B01J7/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/0606 (US);
C01B3/02 (US);
C01B3/04 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
H01M8/065 (EP,US);
H01M8/22 (US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFGAS-ERZEUGER MIT FLEXIBLEM ZUFUHRBAND | [2016/14] | English: | HYDROGEN GAS GENERATOR WITH FLEXIBLE FEED MEMBER | [2014/52] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'HYDROGÈNE AVEC UNE MEMBRE D'ALIMENTATION FLEXIBLE | [2016/14] |
Former [2014/52] | WASSERSTOFFGASERZEUGER MIT FLEXIBLEM ZUFUHRMECHANISMUS | ||
Former [2014/52] | GÉNÉRATEUR D'HYDROGÈNE GAZEUX À ÉLÉMENT D'ALIMENTATION SOUPLE | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2013 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 11.02.2017 | LU | 11.02.2017 | MT | 11.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.02.2013 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.02.2013 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.02.2013 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.02.2013 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3726649 (PELHAM J) [Y] 5 * figure 2 *; | [XYI]EP1467138 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1,4,10-12,16-21,23 * figures 1,2,3a,3b * * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] , [0046] , [0047] * [Y] 5 [I] 2,3,22; | [A]US2008032167 (MATSUOKA KEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * figures 1,9 ** paragraphs [0023] - [0069] *; | [I]US2008035669 (CURELLO ANDREW J [US], et al) [I] 1-4,10,16-21,23 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0071] * |