EP2861402 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING AN IRRIGATION PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maillefer S.A. Av. du Tir Fédéral 44 1024 Ecublens / CH | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESARZENS, Philippe Chemin de Chenalettaz 21 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | 02 /
MOCK, Elmar Général-Dufour 4 CH-2502 Bienne / CH | 03 /
KAUFMANN, Florian Goldgasse 3 CH-4500 Solothurn / CH | 04 /
MALZACH, Samuel Brühlstrasse 19 CH-2503 Biel / CH | 05 /
KLOPFENSTEIN, André Chemin de Rondans 37a CH-2520 La Neuveville / CH | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13709906.5 | 15.03.2013 | [2018/46] | WO2013EP55367 | Priority number, date | CH20120000849 | 18.06.2012 Original published format: CH 8492012 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013189618 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861402 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2861402 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02, A01G25/02, B29C47/10, // B29C47/92, B29C47/90, B29C65/02 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A01G25/026 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/7838 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/157 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/903 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/028 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/522 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/532 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/61 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/8242 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/8244 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/8362 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/934 (EP,CN,US);
B29D23/001 (US);
B29C2948/92066 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92076 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92333 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92561 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/92571 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2948/928 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/2883 (EP,CN,US);
B29C48/908 (EP,US);
B29C48/913 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/872 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/93411 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/93431 (EP,CN,US);
Y02A40/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | B29C47/02, A01G25/02, B29C47/92, B29C47/10, B29C47/90, B29C65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BEWÄSSERUNGSLEITUNG | [2015/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING AN IRRIGATION PIPE | [2015/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION D'UNE CONDUITE D'IRRIGATION | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | GB | 15.03.2019 | IE | 15.03.2019 | LU | 15.03.2019 | MT | 15.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.03.2013 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
MT | 15.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
MT | 15.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
MT | 15.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 15.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 15.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4191518 (KOJIMOTO SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 32 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 5 * [I] 13; | [A]US5282916 (BLOOM SHLOMO [IL]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * claims 1-17 * * figures 1-5 *; | [XDI]WO9955141 (DERMITZAKIS EMMANUIL [GR]) [XD] 1-6,10-12,21,23 * abstract * * page 12, lines 20-21 * * claims 1-17 * * figures 1-11 * [I] 14-19; | [A]US6179949 (BULUSCHEK BRUNO [CH]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * claims 1-11 ** figures 1-7 *; | [XI]EP1403025 (KERTSCHER EBERHARD [CH]) [X] 1-7,9-12,14-16,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-9 * * figure 1 * [I] 8,17-19; | [X]EP2227942 (THOMAS MACHINES S A [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-10,21-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * claims 1-8 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US4191518 | US5282916 | WO9955141 | EP1006778 | EP1403025 | EP1817955 | EP2227942 | US2011056619 |