EP2834975 - LOW-DELAY VIDEO BUFFERING IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Ying 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13710663.9 | 26.02.2013 | [2016/24] | WO2013US27815 | Priority number, date | US201261620266P | 04.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261620266 P | US201261641063P | 01.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261641063 P | US201313776140 | 25.02.2013 Original published format: US201313776140 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013151635 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834975 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834975 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/46, H04N19/44 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04N19/44 (BR,RU,US);
H04N19/20 (RU);
H04N19/46 (EP,BR,RU,US);
G06T9/00 (RU);
H04N19/176 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2015/07] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOPUFFERUNG MIT GERINGER VERZÖGERUNG IN DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2015/07] | English: | LOW-DELAY VIDEO BUFFERING IN VIDEO CODING | [2015/07] | French: | MISE EN MÉMOIRE TAMPON VIDÉO À FAIBLE RETARD DANS UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | LU | 26.02.2017 | MT | 26.02.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/47] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
MT | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
MT | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
MT | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
MT | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004005007 (VISCITO ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraph [0109] *; | [XAI] - KAZUI K ET AL, "Market needs and practicality of sub-picture based CPB operation", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120121), no. JCTVC-H0215, XP030111242 [X] 1,10,20,30 * abstract * * section "1 Introduction" * * section "3. Consideration of CABAC's delay" * * subsection "3.1 Overview" * * subsection "3.2 Example of encoder control for ensuring removal time of a sub-picture" * [A] 2-5,11-14,21-24,31-34 [I] 6-9,15-19,25-29,35-38 | [A] - CHEN Y ET AL, "AHG15: Conforming bitstreams starting with CRA pictures", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111109), no. JCTVC-G319, XP030110303 [A] 1-38 * section "2.3 HRD changes" with all subsections * | [A] - JVT, "HRD/VBV Output Document", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020726), no. JVT-D146, ISSN 0000-0439, XP030005413 [A] 1-38 * sections D.1.2 - D.2.1.2 * | [XPI] - Y-K WANG ET AL, "Sub-picture based CPB operation", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120507), no. m25235, XP030053578 [XP] 1,10,20,30 * the whole document * [I] 6-9,15-19,25-29,35-38 | [IP] - Y-K WANG ET AL, "AHG11: Sub-picture-level low-delay CPB behavior", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120417), no. m24596, XP030052939 [IP] 1,6-10,15-20,25-30,35-38 * the whole document * | [IP] - Y-K WANG (QUALCOMM), "AHG9: Mental cross-check of JCTVC-J0306 on sub-picture based CPB", 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120711), no. m26008, XP030054343 [IP] 1,6-10,15-20,25-30,35-38 * the whole document * | [IP] - DESHPANDE (SHARP) S, "AHG9: On Sub-picture Based CPB", 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120716), no. m25634, XP030053968 [IP] 1,6-10,15-20,25-30,35-38 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BROSS ET AL., "High efficiency video coding (HEVC) text specification draft 6", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT- VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, 8TH MEETING: SAN JOSE, CALIFORNIA, USA, (201202), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc end user/documents/8_San%20Jose/wgll/JCTVC-H1003-v22.zip | - KAZUI ET AL., "Enhancement on operation of coded picture buffer", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT- VC) OFITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, 7TH MEETING: GENEVA, CH, (201111), pages 21 - 30, URL: http://phenix.int- evry.fr/jct/doc end user/documents/7 Geneva/wgl l/JCTVC-G188-v2.zip |