EP2828033 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRWANTO, Bartolomeus Untere Au 11 CH-5200 Brugg / CH | 02 /
ECKERT, Lothar August-Riniker-Strasse 162 CH-5245 Habsburg / CH | 03 /
ROTZINGER, Ralf Ringstrasse 17 79730 Murg-Niederhof / DE | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 13711057.3 | 21.03.2013 | [2017/10] | WO2013EP55982 | Priority number, date | EP20120161145 | 24.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12161145 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013143973 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828033 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2828033 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/047, H02K15/02 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
B23K37/047 (EP,CN);
B23K1/0018 (EP,CN);
B23K31/003 (EP,CN);
B23K31/02 (EP,CN);
B23K37/0426 (EP,CN);
H02K15/024 (EP,CN);
B23K2101/001 (EP,CN);
B23K37/00 (RU);
B23P15/00 (RU);
F01D5/063 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROTORS | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A ROTOR | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ROTOR | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE ROTOR | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2013 | AL | 08.03.2017 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | IE | 21.03.2017 | LU | 21.03.2017 | MT | 21.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | FR | 09.05.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | GB | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2324388 (V PT I TJASCHELOWO MASH MOSKAU [SU], et al) [A] 1-14 * pages 1-5; figure 1 *; | [A]US4086690 (BERNASCONI FELIX) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XA]US2010281688 (KELLER SORIN [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,6,11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0038] - [0043]; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-5,7-10,12-14 |