EP2822402 - GELLED NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/03] | LIQUID NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS | ||
[2016/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNCH, Andrew Sean 1 Olive Mount Villas Liverpool L15 8LX / GB | 02 /
ANDERS, Simon David 100 Wavertree Boulevard Liverpool L7 9PT / GB | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/19] |
Former [2015/03] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13711144.9 | 08.03.2013 | [2017/19] | WO2013NL50150 | Priority number, date | WO2012NL50147 | 09.03.2012 Original published format: PCT/NL2012/050147 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013133711 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822402 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822402 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61P3/00, A61K31/198, A61K31/723, A61K31/732, A61K31/736, A23L2/02, A23L2/66, A61K33/06, A23L33/00, A23L33/16, A23L33/175 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A23L33/16 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/736 (EP,CN,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,CN,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/723 (EP,CN,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,US);
A23V2200/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/30 (EP,US);
A23V2200/32 (EP,US);
A23V2250/00 (EP,US);
A23V2250/032 (EP,US);
A23V2250/06 (EP,US);
A23V2250/1578 (EP,US);
A23V2250/161 (EP,US);
A23V2250/506 (EP,US);
A23V2250/5072 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP,CN);
A61K31/723, A61K2300/00 (US,EP,CN);
A61K31/736, A61K2300/00 (CN,US,EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (CN,US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2250/5086, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/16, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/506, A23V2250/5072, A23V2250/032, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/60, A23V2250/21 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/032, A23V2250/16, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/506, A23V2250/5072, A23V2250/5086, A23V2250/264, A23V2250/242 (CN) (-) |
Former IPC [2015/03] | A23L1/29, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A61P3/00, A61K31/198, A61K31/723, A61K31/732, A61K31/736 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORGELIERTE NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FREIEN AMINOSÄUREN | [2016/50] | English: | GELLED NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS | [2016/50] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE GÉLIFIÉE COMPRENANT DES ACIDES AMINÉS LIBRES | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/03] | FLÜSSIGE NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FREIEN AMINOSÄUREN | ||
Former [2015/03] | LIQUID NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS | ||
Former [2015/03] | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE LIQUIDE COMPRENANT DES ACIDES AMINÉS LIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2015 | Observations by third parties | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2016 | 16.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 21.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2013 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0614616 (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [A] 1-16* page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 44 *; | [A]EP0747395 (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 31 - page 6, line 35 *; | [A]US6506422 (MASSON GERARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 5; examples 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005096845 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 13 - page 8, line 10 *; | [AD]US2006147495 (SULLIVAN IAN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2008021106 (PETIT ROBERT G II [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055]; example 1 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * | Examination | WO2008015374 | JP2009106217 | - "PRODUKTNAME // PZN Zutaten ALLERGENHINWEISE Packungsgröße Dosierung und Anwendung PKU SQUEEZIE // PZN 8468949 Wasser", (20160404), URL: http://api.gebrauchs.info/974f18e63eb8df811bcb8ada0d59bb1ai, (20160404), XP055262602 | - MEDPEX APOTHEKE, "PKU squeezie Gel 30x85 Gramm online bestellen - medpex Versandapotheke", (20160404), URL: http://www.medpex.de/pku-squeezie-gel-p8468949?q=PKU+sqeezie&pn=1&fs=89.48&fp=1&fop=1, (20160404), XP055262612 | by applicant | US2006147495 | other | - "NEW ADDITIONS TO VITAFLO'S PRODUCT RANGE", VITAFLO, (20120210), URL: HTTP://WWW.VITAFLO.CO.UK/BLOG/2012/02/, XP003035900 |