EP2822975 - POLYOLEFIN ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown TX 77520-2101 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVISHANKAR, Periagaram, S. 6006 Soaring Pine Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 02 /
WANG, Yu, Feng 15907 Moon Rock Drive Houston, TX 77062 / US | 03 /
STEPHENS, Luke, P. 2350 Bagby Street 9308 Houston, TX 77006 / US | 04 /
BARSAN, Florin 3623 Brookstone Court Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 05 /
BERTI, Douglas, A. 15711 Elk Park Lane Houston, TX 77062 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC, et al IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., et al IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 13711993.9 | 28.02.2013 | [2018/17] | WO2013US28270 | Priority number, date | US201261609020P | 09.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261609020 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013134041 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2822975 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822975 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00, C08F6/00, C08F10/06, C08F6/10, C08F6/12, C08L23/14, C08F6/04 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
C09J123/142 (EP,US);
C09J123/12 (US);
C08F6/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2207/10 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/04, C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L23/142 (EP);
C09J123/142, C08L23/142 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | C08F2/00, C08F6/00, C08F10/06, C08F6/10, C08F6/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINHAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/03] | English: | POLYOLEFIN ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE SAME | [2015/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES À BASE DE POLYOLÉFINES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2013 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006083515 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-38; tables IIIA, IIIB *; | [X]US2009163642 (KISS GABOR [US], et al) [X] 1-14,19,20 * claims 1-25; tables EP2, PP2 *; | [X]WO2009082468 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [X] 21,22,25* figures 2,3; examples S79-S84; claims 1-19; table 2b *; | [X]WO2011087731 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 21-25 * pages 95,100; claims 1,13; table 1 * | by applicant | US4540753 | US6525157 | US2004236042 | US6881800 | US7033152 | US7163989 | US7226553 | US7470118 | US7601666 | - WHEELER; WILLIS, APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, (1993), vol. 47, pages 1128 - 1130 | - H. N. CHENG, MACROMOLECULES, (1984), vol. 17, page 1950 | - VERSTRATE, MACROMOLECULES, (1988), vol. 21, page 3360 | US20100972140 |